Jamieson Family Trustee Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429035631361) was incorporated on 02 Dec 2003. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Building 2, 195 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 (type: registered, physical). Level 2, 161 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland had been their registered address, until 03 Nov 2021. Jamieson Family Trustee Limited used other names, namely: M G Thomson Trustees No.4 Limited from 02 Dec 2003 to 30 Oct 2012. 10 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 5 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Jamieson, Ailsa Dene (an individual) located at Orewa postcode 0931. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 5 shares); it includes
Jamieson, Gray Stephen Barr (an individual) - located at Orewa. The Businesscheck information was updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Building 2, 195 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 | Registered & physical & service | 03 Nov 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ailsa Dene Jamieson
Orewa, 0931
Address used since 18 May 2011 |
Director | 24 Aug 2009 - current |
Gray Stephen Barr Jamieson
Orewa, 0931
Address used since 18 May 2011 |
Director | 24 Aug 2009 - current |
Michael George Thomson
Glenfield, Auckland, 0629
Address used since 02 Dec 2003 |
Director | 02 Dec 2003 - 24 Aug 2009 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 161 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical | 26 May 2011 - 03 Nov 2021 |
C/-mcelroy Dutt & Thomson, Level 2, 161 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland 1023 | Physical & registered | 25 May 2010 - 26 May 2011 |
C/- Mcelroy Dutt & Thomson, Level 2, 161 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland | Physical & registered | 02 Dec 2003 - 25 May 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jamieson, Ailsa Dene Individual |
Orewa 0931 |
13 May 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jamieson, Gray Stephen Barr Individual |
Orewa 0931 |
13 May 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jaimeson, Ailsa Dene Individual |
Orewa 0931 Orewa 0931 |
08 Sep 2009 - 13 May 2016 |
Thomson, Michael George Individual |
Glenfield Auckland |
02 Dec 2003 - 08 Sep 2009 |
Jaimeson, Gray Stephen Barr Individual |
Orewa 0931 |
08 Sep 2009 - 13 May 2016 |
Business In The Community (2013) Limited Level 3, 255 Broadway |
|
Penrose Panel And Roofing Limited Level 2, 161 Manukau Road |
|
Exodus Trustees Limited Level 1, 10 Manukau Road |
|
Marianas Capital Limited Level 2, 142 Broadway, Newmarket |
|
Growingfund Investment Limited Level 1, 169 Manukau Road |
|
K J M Holdings Limited Level 1, 145 Manukau Road |