Undergroundsound Limited (issued a business number of 9429035644347) was launched on 11 Dec 2003. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: Level 2, 17 Garrett Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 (type: office, delivery). 41 Percy Cameron Street, Avalon, Lower Hutt had been their registered address, until 02 Oct 2019. 10000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 4000 shares (40 per cent of shares), namely:
The Gibson Group Limited (an entity) located at Wellington Central, Wellington postcode 6011. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 60 per cent of all shares (6000 shares); it includes
Burton, Philip Leonard (an individual) - located at Korokoro, Petone. "Film or video post-production services" (business classification J551405) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Undergroundsound Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Kippenberger & Assoc, 21 Ganges Road, Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 24 May 2011 |
Po Box 38085, Wellington Mail Centre, Lower Hutt, 5045 | Postal | 24 Sep 2019 |
17 Garrett Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered & service | 02 Oct 2019 |
Level 2, 17 Garrett Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Office & delivery | 07 Sep 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Philip Leonard Burton
Korokoro, Petone, 5012
Address used since 11 Dec 2003 |
Director | 11 Dec 2003 - current |
Victoria Urshla Spackman
Brooklyn, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 26 Mar 2022
Newtwon, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 31 Jan 2014
Newtown, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 24 Sep 2019 |
Director | 31 Jan 2014 - current |
Ian Leslie
Kelson, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 20 Mar 2013 |
Director | 20 Mar 2013 - 01 Dec 2023 |
David Timothy Gibson
Wellington,
Address used since 19 Oct 2007 |
Director | 19 Oct 2007 - 31 Jan 2014 |
Benjamin James Edward Sinclair
Silverstream, Upper Hutt, 5019
Address used since 11 Dec 2003 |
Director | 11 Dec 2003 - 20 Mar 2013 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 17 Garrett Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Office & delivery | 07 Sep 2021 |
Level 2, 17 Garrett Street , Te Aro , Wellington , 6011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
41 Percy Cameron Street, Avalon, Lower Hutt, 5011 | Registered & physical | 04 Oct 2018 - 02 Oct 2019 |
21 Ganges Road, Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 | Physical | 14 Sep 2011 - 04 Oct 2018 |
21 Ganges Road, Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 | Registered | 01 Jun 2011 - 04 Oct 2018 |
19-21 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington | Physical | 31 Oct 2007 - 14 Sep 2011 |
19-21 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington | Registered | 31 Oct 2007 - 01 Jun 2011 |
60a Kent Terrace, Wellington | Registered & physical | 11 Dec 2003 - 31 Oct 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Gibson Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040813639 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
24 Oct 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burton, Philip Leonard Individual |
Korokoro Petone 5012 |
11 Dec 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Leslie, Ian Individual |
Kelson Lower Hutt 5010 |
08 Nov 2013 - 06 Dec 2023 |
Sinclair, Benjamin James Edward Individual |
Silverstream Upper Hutt |
11 Dec 2003 - 08 Nov 2013 |
Khandallah Villas Trust Board Inc 21 Ganges Road |
|
Amity Club Incorporated 21 Ganges Road |
|
Flat Creek Coal Company Limited 23 Ganges Road |
|
A.j. Woods Limited 31 Ganges Road |
|
Affiliated Insurance Brokers Limited 31 Ganges Road |
Shiny Limited 51 Chelmsford Street |
Matrix Production Studios Limited Level 1, 25 Hopper St |
Soundmatter Sound Design Limited 105 Tasman Street |
Five Am Film Limited Flat 6c, 1 Hanson Street |
Liquidhotmagma Limited 1 Akaroa Drive |
T-media Limited Flat 28, 7 Duncan Terrace |