Monro Building Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429035923077) was incorporated on 25 Jun 2003. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: P O Box 1307, Nelson, 7040 (type: postal, office). 34 Laval Heights, Washington Valley, Nelson had been their physical address, until 21 Sep 2018. 50 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 25 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Currie, Iain Laurie (an individual) located at Brightwater, Brightwater postcode 7022. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (25 shares); it includes
Whalley, Robin (an individual) - located at Nelson. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
285 Hardy Street, Nelson, 7010 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Sep 2018 |
P O Box 1307, Nelson, 7040 | Postal | 02 May 2023 |
285 Hardy Street, Nelson, 7010 | Office & delivery | 02 May 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Robin Whalley
Stepneyville, Nelson, 7010
Address used since 02 May 2016 |
Director | 25 Jun 2003 - current |
Iain Laurie Currie
Brightwater, Brightwater, 7022
Address used since 13 Sep 2018 |
Director | 13 Sep 2018 - current |
Ian Lindsay Hay
Nelson, Nelson, 7010
Address used since 02 May 2016 |
Director | 25 Jun 2003 - 20 Sep 2018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
34 Laval Heights, Washington Valley, Nelson, 7010 | Physical | 04 Jun 2015 - 21 Sep 2018 |
34 Laval Heights, Washington Valley, Nelson, 7010 | Registered | 07 Jun 2013 - 21 Sep 2018 |
34 Laval Heights, Washington Valley, Nelson, 7010 | Physical | 07 Jun 2013 - 04 Jun 2015 |
Whitby House, Level 3, 7 Alma Street, Buston Square, Nelson, 7010 | Physical & registered | 30 Apr 2013 - 07 Jun 2013 |
Richards Woodhouse, 105 Trafalgar Street, Nelson 7010 | Registered & physical | 09 Jun 2010 - 30 Apr 2013 |
Richards Woodhouse, 105 Trafalgar Street, Nelson | Registered & physical | 18 Apr 2004 - 09 Jun 2010 |
Richards Woodhouse, 9 Buxton Square, Nelson | Physical & registered | 25 Jun 2003 - 18 Apr 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Currie, Iain Laurie Individual |
Brightwater Brightwater 7022 |
13 Sep 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Whalley, Robin Individual |
Nelson 7010 |
25 Jun 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hay, Ian Lindsay Individual |
Nelson 7010 |
25 Jun 2003 - 13 Sep 2018 |
Hanover Road Holdings Limited 23 Laval Heights |
|
Turd Burglars Limited 26 Laval Heights |
|
Pukeko Capital Holdings Limited 26 Laval Heights |
|
Nelson District Parents Centre Incorporated 12 Laval Heights |
|
Krouger Contracting Limited 1 Laval Heights |
|
The Communication Collective Trust 25 Wolfe Street |