Airedale Rosebery Irrigation Company Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429035950721) was registered on 03 Jun 2003. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (type: physical, registered). Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin had been their physical address, until 21 Mar 2017. 605 shares are allocated to 16 shareholders who belong to 11 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 12 shares (1.98% of shares), namely:
Mnl Trustee Limited (an entity) located at 47 Hereford Street, Christchurch postcode 8013,
Crabbe, Nicole Ruby (an individual) located at Rd 3D, Oamaru postcode 9492,
Crabbe, Mark James (an individual) located at Rd 3D, Oamaru postcode 9492. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 13.55% of all shares (exactly 82 shares); it includes
Hilderlands Farms Limited (an entity) - located at Rd 140, Oamaru. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (74 shares, 12.23%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Foxhaven Farms Limited, located at Oamaru (an entity). Businesscheck's data was updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & registered & service | 21 Mar 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Tony James Fox
3 D R D, Oamaru, 9492
Address used since 18 Nov 2010 |
Director | 18 Nov 2010 - current |
Stefan John Mavor
Rd 5d, Oamaru, 9492
Address used since 20 Oct 2011 |
Director | 20 Oct 2011 - current |
Justin Paul Meikle
Rd 2d, Oamaru, 9492
Address used since 31 Oct 2013 |
Director | 31 Oct 2013 - current |
Scott Colin Gibson
Rd 1d, Oamaru, 9492
Address used since 17 Nov 2015 |
Director | 17 Nov 2015 - current |
Richard Paul Willans
Rd 14o, Oamaru, 9495
Address used since 19 Nov 2020 |
Director | 19 Nov 2020 - current |
Robert Barrie Elliott
Rd 1d, Oamaru, 9492
Address used since 17 Nov 2015 |
Director | 17 Nov 2015 - 19 Nov 2020 |
Colin Richard Mavor
2 D R D, Oamaru 9492,
Address used since 01 Feb 2008 |
Director | 03 Jun 2003 - 17 Nov 2015 |
Richard Paul Willans
15-k R D, Oamaru,
Address used since 18 Nov 2009 |
Director | 18 Nov 2009 - 30 Oct 2014 |
Trevor John Meikle
2-a R D, Oamaru,
Address used since 12 Feb 2009 |
Director | 30 Jul 2003 - 31 Oct 2013 |
Geoffrey Bruce Mavor
Oamaru 9492,
Address used since 10 Dec 2007 |
Director | 10 Dec 2007 - 20 Oct 2011 |
Robert Rayner Fox
1 D R D, Oamaru 9492,
Address used since 01 Feb 2008 |
Director | 03 Jun 2003 - 18 Nov 2010 |
Bruce Edward Mavor
3 D R D, Oamaru,
Address used since 30 Jul 2003 |
Director | 30 Jul 2003 - 08 Nov 2007 |
Thomas Edwin Stephens
3-d R D, Oamaru,
Address used since 30 Jul 2003 |
Director | 30 Jul 2003 - 20 Aug 2004 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & registered | 04 Mar 2008 - 21 Mar 2017 |
Harvie Green Wyatt, Chartered Accountants, Level 5,229 Moray Place, Dunedin | Physical & registered | 25 Jun 2003 - 04 Mar 2008 |
Berry & Co, Solicitors, 20 Eden Street, Oamaru | Registered & physical | 03 Jun 2003 - 25 Jun 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mnl Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051758165 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
47 Hereford Street Christchurch 8013 |
11 Apr 2024 - current |
Crabbe, Nicole Ruby Individual |
Rd 3d Oamaru 9492 |
11 Apr 2024 - current |
Crabbe, Mark James Individual |
Rd 3d Oamaru 9492 |
11 Apr 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hilderlands Farms Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036450930 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd 140 Oamaru 9495 |
20 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Foxhaven Farms Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034736760 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Oamaru 9400 |
10 Jul 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gibson Land Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042125228 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Ashburton Ashburton 7700 |
17 Oct 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fox, Deborah Ann Individual |
3 D R D Oamaru |
19 Feb 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gibb, Allison Margaret Individual |
Oamaru 9492 |
19 Feb 2004 - current |
Gibb, Barry James Individual |
Airedale Oamaru 9492 |
19 Feb 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mavor Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038123139 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 |
19 Feb 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rosebery Farm Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033303079 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd 2d Oamaru 9492 |
26 Feb 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Valridge Farm Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033299624 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
100 Moorhouse Avenue Christchurch 8011 |
13 May 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Withoutalid Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035974659 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Oamaru |
16 Apr 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Elliott, Robert Barrie Individual |
Redcastle Road 1 D R D , Oamaru 9400 |
19 Feb 2004 - current |
Elliott, Hazel Esther Individual |
Redcastle Road 1 D R D , Oamaru 9400 |
19 Feb 2004 - current |
Clements, John Individual |
(trustee R B & H E Elliott Family Trust) Oamaru 9400 |
07 Nov 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ambler, Pamela May Individual |
Rd 3d Oamaru 9492 |
15 Jan 2014 - 11 Apr 2024 |
Ambler, Pamela May Individual |
Rd 3d Oamaru 9492 |
15 Jan 2014 - 11 Apr 2024 |
Ambler, Murray John Individual |
Rd 3d Oamaru 9492 |
15 Jan 2014 - 11 Apr 2024 |
Ambler, Murray John Individual |
Rd 3d Oamaru 9492 |
15 Jan 2014 - 11 Apr 2024 |
Mckenzie Accountants Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036495153 Company Number: 1210892 Entity |
Oamaru Oamaru 9400 |
15 Jan 2014 - 11 Apr 2024 |
Kington, Melvyn John Individual |
3 D R D Oamaru |
19 Feb 2004 - 15 Jan 2014 |
Fox, Gary Rayner Individual |
3 D R D Oamaru |
19 Feb 2004 - 08 Mar 2022 |
Harvie, Douglas James Individual |
195 Musselburgh Rise Dunedin 9013 |
27 Feb 2007 - 26 Feb 2008 |
Colyde Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034758373 Company Number: 1636387 Entity |
Timaru 7910 |
19 Aug 2015 - 20 Mar 2020 |
Hilderlands Farms Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036450930 Company Number: 1218500 Entity |
03 Dec 2007 - 19 Aug 2015 | |
Hgw Trustee's Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037448110 Company Number: 986068 Entity |
19 Feb 2004 - 16 Apr 2012 | |
Hgw Trustee's Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037448110 Company Number: 986068 Entity |
19 Feb 2004 - 16 Apr 2012 | |
Hgw Trustee's Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037448110 Company Number: 986068 Entity |
19 Feb 2004 - 16 Apr 2012 | |
Fox, Robert Rayner Individual |
1 D R D Oamaru 9492 |
19 Feb 2004 - 10 Jul 2013 |
Behrens, Heike Individual |
Oamaru |
10 Sep 2004 - 27 Feb 2007 |
Fox, Tony James Individual |
3 D R D Oamaru |
19 Feb 2004 - 08 Mar 2022 |
Fox, Alexandra Megan Ramsay Individual |
3 D R D Oamaru |
19 Feb 2004 - 08 Mar 2022 |
Colyde Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034758373 Company Number: 1636387 Entity |
Timaru 7910 |
19 Aug 2015 - 20 Mar 2020 |
Hilderlands Farms Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036450930 Company Number: 1218500 Entity |
03 Dec 2007 - 19 Aug 2015 | |
Fox, Robert Rayner Individual |
1 D R D Oamaru |
19 Feb 2004 - 10 Jul 2013 |
Banco Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037369569 Company Number: 1014223 Entity |
19 Feb 2004 - 27 Nov 2006 | |
Mavor, Bruce Edward Individual |
3 D R D Oamaru |
19 Feb 2004 - 20 Dec 2007 |
Mavor, Colin Richard Individual |
2 D Rd Oamaru |
03 Jun 2003 - 23 Feb 2005 |
Gibson, Lynne Beverley Individual |
Seadowns 1 D R D , Oamaru |
19 Feb 2004 - 17 Oct 2017 |
Stephens, Thomas Edwin Individual |
Airedale Teaneraki Road 3 D R D, Oamaru |
19 Feb 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Stephens, Jennifer Mary Individual |
Airedale Teaneraki Road 3 D R D , Oamaru |
19 Feb 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Meikle, Gail Lesley Individual |
2 D R D Oamaru 9492 |
19 Feb 2004 - 26 Feb 2008 |
Behrens, Dietmar Individual |
Oamaru |
10 Sep 2004 - 27 Feb 2007 |
Fox, Lesley Vera Individual |
1 D R D Oamaru 9492 |
19 Feb 2004 - 10 Jul 2013 |
Mavor, Doreen Ellen Individual |
3 D R D Oamaru 9492 |
19 Feb 2004 - 16 Apr 2012 |
Brady, Anthony John Individual |
South Hill Oamaru 9400 |
27 Nov 2006 - 09 Sep 2013 |
Meikle, Trevor John Individual |
2 D R D Oamaru 9492 |
19 Feb 2004 - 26 Feb 2008 |
Mckenzie, Linda Teresa Individual |
5 D R D Oamaru |
10 Sep 2004 - 03 Dec 2007 |
Gibson, Colin Alexander Individual |
Seadowns 1 D R D, Oamaru |
19 Feb 2004 - 17 Oct 2017 |
Mckenzie, Ian David Individual |
5 D R D Oamaru |
10 Sep 2004 - 03 Dec 2007 |
Hgw Trustee's Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037448110 Company Number: 986068 Entity |
19 Feb 2004 - 16 Apr 2012 | |
Kington, Lorraine Jill Individual |
3 D R D Oamaru |
19 Feb 2004 - 15 Jan 2014 |
Banco Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037369569 Company Number: 1014223 Entity |
19 Feb 2004 - 27 Nov 2006 |
Innovative Health Technologies (n Z ) Limited Level 5, 229 Moray Place |
|
Farm 18 Limited Level 1, 205 Princes Street |
|
Lasered By Lynette Limited Level 1, 243 Princes Street |
|
Ben Ledi Farming Limited Level 5, 229 Moray Place |
|
Hbx Limited Level 3, 258 Stuart Street |
|
B J D Trustee Company Limited Level 7, Forsyth Barr House, The Octagon |