Retina Specialists Limited (NZBN 9429035998136) was launched on 04 Jun 2003. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 20 Titoki Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: physical, registered). 8 Canterbury Place, Parnell, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 14 Jul 2014. 900 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 300 shares (33.33% of shares), namely:
Sheck, Leo Hei Nam (an individual) located at Orakei, Auckland postcode 1071. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33% of all shares (300 shares); it includes
Vincent, Andrea Louise (an individual) - located at Remuera, Auckland. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (300 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Barnes, Rachel Mary, located at Chatswood, Auckland (an individual). The Businesscheck data was last updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
20 Titoki Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & registered & service | 14 Jul 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Rachel Mary Barnes
Chatswood, Auckland, 0626
Address used since 21 Oct 2015 |
Director | 01 Apr 2004 - current |
Andrea Louise Vincent
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 21 Oct 2015 |
Director | 01 Apr 2012 - current |
Leo Hei Nam Sheck
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 22 Dec 2020 |
Director | 22 Dec 2020 - current |
Dianne Margaret Sharp
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 04 Jun 2003 |
Director | 04 Jun 2003 - 22 Dec 2020 |
Ian Desmond Elliott
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 01 Apr 2004 |
Director | 01 Apr 2004 - 01 Apr 2012 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
8 Canterbury Place, Parnell, Auckland | Physical & registered | 04 Jun 2003 - 14 Jul 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sheck, Leo Hei Nam Individual |
Orakei Auckland 1071 |
22 Dec 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Vincent, Andrea Louise Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
05 Apr 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Barnes, Rachel Mary Individual |
Chatswood Auckland 0626 |
05 Dec 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sharp, Dianne Margaret Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
04 Jun 2003 - 22 Dec 2020 |
Elliott, Ian Desmond Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
05 Dec 2005 - 05 Apr 2012 |
Cjhb Limited 20 Titoki Street |
|
Birthcare Holdings Limited Level 3 |
|
Birthcare Huntly Limited Level 3 |
|
Birthcare Auckland Limited Level 3 |
|
Auckland Obstetric Centre Limited Ground Floor, Birthcare Building |
|
Domain Orthopaedic Surgeons Limited Ground Floor, Birthcare Building |