Nafco Limited (NZBN 9429036025893) was launched on 11 Apr 2003. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 2, 142 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, registered). Alliott Nz Ltd, Ground Floor, 109, Carlton Gore Rd, Newmarket, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 08 Mar 2011. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Reynolds, Alan Murray (an individual) located at Rd 2, Waipu postcode 0582. "Holding company operation - passive investment in subsidiary companies" (business classification K624030) is the classification the ABS issued Nafco Limited. Our data was last updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 142 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered & service | 08 Mar 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alan Murray Reynolds
Rd 2, Waipu, 0582
Address used since 14 Mar 2014 |
Director | 11 Apr 2003 - current |
Susan Shirley Reynolds
Rd 2, Waipu, 0582
Address used since 14 Mar 2014 |
Director | 11 Apr 2003 - current |
Richard Thomas Salisbury
Hamilton,
Address used since 11 Apr 2003 |
Director | 11 Apr 2003 - 11 Apr 2003 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Alliott Nz Ltd, Ground Floor, 109, Carlton Gore Rd, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical | 24 Jun 2008 - 08 Mar 2011 |
C/o -alliott Nz Ltd, Ground Floor, 109 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket | Registered | 24 Jun 2008 - 08 Mar 2011 |
Alliott Thompson Francis Ltd, Chartered, Accountants, 109 Carlton Gore Rd, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered & physical | 11 Apr 2003 - 24 Jun 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reynolds, Alan Murray Individual |
Rd 2 Waipu 0582 |
05 Jul 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reynolds, Susan Shirley Individual |
Langs Beach Northland |
05 Jul 2004 - 05 Jul 2004 |
Salisbury, Richard Thomas Individual |
Hamilton |
11 Apr 2003 - 05 Jul 2004 |
Business In The Community (2013) Limited Level 3, 255 Broadway |
|
Penrose Panel And Roofing Limited Level 2, 161 Manukau Road |
|
Exodus Trustees Limited Level 1, 10 Manukau Road |
|
Marianas Capital Limited Level 2, 142 Broadway, Newmarket |
|
Growingfund Investment Limited Level 1, 169 Manukau Road |
|
K J M Holdings Limited Level 1, 145 Manukau Road |
Capitol Cinema Limited 427 Manukau Road |
Ng International Limited 11 Irene Avenue |
Analey Holdings Limited 59 Epsom Avenue |
Zitan Group Limited 66 Empire Road |
Rashni Trust Limited 12a Marsden Avenue |
Wang Family Trust Limited 1a St Leonards Road |