Dundee Corporation Limited (issued a business number of 9429036070381) was started on 28 Mar 2003. 6 addresess are in use by the company: 18 Dolamore Place, Wainoni, Christchurch, 8061 (type: delivery, delivery). 18 Dolamore Place, Christchurch had been their registered address, up until 26 May 2010. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Law, David Andrew (an individual) located at Edgeware, Christchurch postcode 8013,
Law, Joan Margaret (an individual) located at Edgeware, Christchurch postcode 8013. "Building, non-residential - renting or leasing" (ANZSIC L671210) is the classification the ABS issued to Dundee Corporation Limited. Our data was updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
18 Dolamore Place, Wainoni, Christchurch, 8061 | Physical & registered & service | 26 May 2010 |
14b Dolamore Place, Wainoni, Christchurch, 8061 | Delivery | 06 May 2019 |
18 Dolamore Place, Wainoni, Christchurch, 8061 | Postal & office | 06 May 2019 |
18 Dolamore Place, Wainoni, Christchurch, 8061 | Delivery | 25 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Andrew Law
Edgeware, Christchurch, 8013
Address used since 19 May 2010 |
Director | 28 Mar 2003 - current |
Ian Andrew Law
Wainoni, Christchurch, 8061
Address used since 01 Dec 2017
Spreydon, Christchurch, 8024
Address used since 30 May 2016 |
Director | 28 Mar 2003 - 15 Sep 2023 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
18 Dolamore Place, Wainoni, Christchurch, 8061 | Delivery | 25 Sep 2023 |
18 Dolamore Place , Wainoni , Christchurch , 8061 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
18 Dolamore Place, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 29 Jun 2004 - 26 May 2010 |
Hooker Associates Limited, 79 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 28 Mar 2003 - 29 Jun 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Law, David Andrew Individual |
Edgeware Christchurch 8013 |
28 Mar 2003 - current |
Law, Joan Margaret Individual |
Edgeware Christchurch 8013 |
28 Mar 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
New Zealand Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037527280 Company Number: 970683 Entity |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
28 Mar 2003 - 20 Oct 2023 |
Law, Ian Andrew Individual |
Wainoni Christchurch 8061 |
28 Mar 2003 - 20 Oct 2023 |
Law, Ian Andrew Individual |
Wainoni Christchurch 8061 |
28 Mar 2003 - 20 Oct 2023 |
Scorpio Corporation Limited 18 Dolamore Place |
|
Tru Track Limited 18 Dolamore Place |
|
Celebration Food Link Trust 81 Bickerton Street |
|
Metro Youth Trust 81 Bickerton Street |
|
Celebration Centre Nelson 81 Bickerton Street |
|
The Gateway Trust 81 Bickerton Street |
Longcroft Holdings Limited 2 Strathmore Gardens |
Resource Oil Limited 10 Barton Street |
Pianaitch Holdings Limited 25 Woodhaven Place |
Lemi Holdings 2 Limited 318 Marshland Road |
Qb Newmarket Limited 19 Southwark Street |
Kruger Parade Limited Unit 3, 245 St Asaph Street |