38 Lowe Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429036086382) was started on 13 Mar 2003. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 26 Shrewsbury Street, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 (type: registered, service). L3, 2 Hazeldean Road, Addington, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 06 Aug 2018. 38 Lowe Limited used other aliases, namely: Horncastle Property Management Limited from 18 Oct 2011 to 10 Jun 2019, Complete Property Management Limited (13 Mar 2003 to 18 Oct 2011). 10 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 10 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Udone Investments Limited (an entity) located at Christchurch postcode 8011. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 09 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
L3, 134 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical & service | 06 Aug 2018 |
26 Shrewsbury Street, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 | Registered & service | 21 Jun 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
William John Horncastle
Addington, Christchurch, 8011
Address used since 24 Oct 2014
Fendalton, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 23 May 2018 |
Director | 13 Mar 2003 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
L3, 2 Hazeldean Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Registered & physical | 27 Oct 2015 - 06 Aug 2018 |
Level 3, 2 Hazeldean Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Registered & physical | 28 Nov 2013 - 27 Oct 2015 |
Level 1 The Antarctic Attraction, 38 Orchard Road, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered & physical | 20 Feb 2012 - 28 Nov 2013 |
Level 5 Grant Thornton House, 47 Cathedral Square, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical | 30 Jul 2010 - 20 Feb 2012 |
C/-grant Thornton New Zealand Ltd, Level 9 Anthony Harper Building, 47 Cathedral Square, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 02 Mar 2010 - 30 Jul 2010 |
C/-grant Thornton (christchurch) Ltd, 9th Floor Anthony Harper Building, 47 Cathedral Square, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 20 May 2004 - 02 Mar 2010 |
C/- Meyer & Co, 85 Picton Avenue, Riccarton, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 13 Mar 2003 - 20 May 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Udone Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041172728 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Christchurch 8011 |
16 Oct 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Udone Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041172728 Company Number: 5072662 Entity |
18 Nov 2014 - 16 Oct 2015 | |
Horncastle, William John Individual |
38 Orchard Road Christchurch 8053 |
13 Mar 2003 - 18 Nov 2014 |
Udone Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041172728 Company Number: 5072662 Entity |
18 Nov 2014 - 16 Oct 2015 | |
Gilbraltar Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034671054 Company Number: 1657901 Entity |
18 Aug 2009 - 18 Nov 2014 | |
Johnston, Simon Andrew Individual |
Christchurch |
25 Feb 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Wjh Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041172728 Company Number: 5072662 Entity |
18 Nov 2014 - 16 Oct 2015 | |
Gilbraltar Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034671054 Company Number: 1657901 Entity |
18 Aug 2009 - 18 Nov 2014 | |
Wjh Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041172728 Company Number: 5072662 Entity |
18 Nov 2014 - 16 Oct 2015 |
French Bakery Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |
|
Bunny Finance Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |
|
Close Quarters Holdings Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |
|
Taoco NZ Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |
|
Safe Site Essentials Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |
|
James Milne Holdings Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |