Headway International Limited (issued a business number of 9429036167890) was incorporated on 10 Feb 2003. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 18 Louvain Avenue, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 (type: registered, physical). 18 Louvain Avenue, Mt Roskill, Auckland had been their physical address, until 09 Mar 2009. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Lu, Qian (an individual) located at Lynfield, Auckland postcode 1042. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Jin, Yang Hua (an individual) - located at Avondale, Auckland, New Zealand. Our database was last updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
18 Louvain Avenue, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 | Registered & physical & service | 09 Mar 2009 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Yanghua Jin
Mt Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 20 May 2016 |
Director | 02 Mar 2009 - current |
Shufen Du
Auckland,
Address used since 01 Apr 2007 |
Director | 01 Apr 2007 - 04 Jun 2009 |
Tao Chen
Greenlane, Auckland, New Zealand,
Address used since 10 Feb 2003 |
Director | 10 Feb 2003 - 02 Mar 2009 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
18 Louvain Avenue, Mt Roskill, Auckland | Physical | 14 Feb 2008 - 09 Mar 2009 |
557 Dominion Road, Mt Eden, Auckland | Physical | 02 May 2006 - 14 Feb 2008 |
Nair & Associates Chartered Accountants, 280 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland | Registered | 02 May 2006 - 09 Mar 2009 |
69 Morningside Drive, Morningside, Auckland, New Zealand | Registered & physical | 08 Apr 2004 - 02 May 2006 |
3/2141 Great North Road, Avondale, Auckland, New Zealand | Registered & physical | 10 Feb 2003 - 08 Apr 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lu, Qian Individual |
Lynfield Auckland 1042 |
23 Mar 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jin, Yang Hua Individual |
Avondale Auckland, New Zealand |
10 Feb 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chen, Tao Individual |
Greenlane Auckland, New Zealand |
10 Feb 2003 - 02 Jul 2007 |
Shen, Nina Individual |
Auckland |
22 Mar 2010 - 07 Mar 2013 |
Luo, Yong Individual |
Glenfield North Shore, New Zealand |
01 Apr 2004 - 01 Apr 2004 |
Wang, Wei Guo Individual |
Three King Auckland, New Zealand |
10 Feb 2003 - 02 Jul 2007 |
Du, Shufen Individual |
Auckland |
02 Jul 2007 - 02 Mar 2009 |
Solid Tile Limited 20a Louvain Avenue |
|
Loring Investments Limited 14 Louvain Avenue |
|
Nand Investments Limited 13a Louvain Avenue |
|
Lily And William Property Limited 26a Hardley Avenue |
|
Whammy Limited 23 Cambrai Avenue |
|
Bala Vidya Consulting Limited 6a Cambrai Avenue |