Celsius It Limited (NZBN 9429036173976) was registered on 16 Jan 2003. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 83 Manuwai Lane, Rd2 Drury, Auckland, 2578 (type: registered, physical). 83 Manuwai Lane, Karaka had been their registered address, up to 15 Apr 2021. 100000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 95000 shares (95 per cent of shares), namely:
Herbert Trust Management Limited (an entity) located at 19 Victoria Street, Cambridge,
Maunder, Richard Bruce (an individual) located at Karaka, Auckland. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 2.5 per cent of all shares (2500 shares); it includes
Maunder, Sonya Rae (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Drury. "Computer consultancy service" (ANZSIC M700010) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Celsius It Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
83 Manuwai Lane, Rd2 Drury, Auckland, 2578 | Registered & physical & service | 15 Apr 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Richard Bruce Maunder
Rd 2, Drury, 2578
Address used since 27 Apr 2010 |
Director | 16 Jan 2003 - current |
83 Manuwai Lane , Rd2 Drury , Auckland , 2578 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
83 Manuwai Lane, Karaka | Registered & physical | 30 Jul 2003 - 15 Apr 2021 |
176b Grey Street, Onehunga, Auckland | Physical & registered | 16 Jan 2003 - 30 Jul 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Herbert Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036761920 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
19 Victoria Street Cambridge |
29 Sep 2005 - current |
Maunder, Richard Bruce Individual |
Karaka Auckland |
29 Sep 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Maunder, Sonya Rae Individual |
Rd 2 Drury 2578 |
23 Sep 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lava Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037814533 Company Number: 914476 Entity |
16 Jan 2003 - 29 Sep 2005 | |
Maunder, Richard Bruce Individual |
Karaka Auckland |
24 May 2004 - 24 May 2004 |
Lava Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037814533 Company Number: 914476 Entity |
16 Jan 2003 - 29 Sep 2005 |
Meilly NZ Limited 86 Manuwai Lane |
|
Cooinda Services Limited 54 Manuwai Lane |
|
Specimen Tree Landscapes Limited 49 Manuwai Lane |
|
Applied Conveyor And Polymers Limited 30 Manuwai Lane |
|
Slippery Creek Kayak Hire Limited 39 Manuwai Lane |
|
Hks Electrix Limited 35 Manuwai Lane |
Entek Limited 109a Sim Road |
Perry Consulting Limited 7 Cornwall Place |
Fusion East Limited 39 Anchorage Drive |
Turbotech Solutions Limited 241 Great South Road |
Kerkys Limited 1 Gleneagles Grove |
Gb International Limited 120 Great South Road |