Prime Joinery Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036266180) was started on 25 Oct 2002. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8013 (type: postal, office). 58 Fendalton Road, Fendalton, Christchurch had been their physical address, up until 10 May 2018. Prime Joinery Limited used more aliases, namely: Modulink Interiors Limited from 14 Apr 2003 to 19 Apr 2017, Modulink Office Interiors 2002 Limited (25 Oct 2002 to 14 Apr 2003). 100 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Meba Limited (an entity) located at Bryndwr, Christchurch postcode 8053. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Syme, Roger William (an individual) - located at Avonhead, Christchurch. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (49 shares, 49%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Lewis, Craig Brian, located at West Melton, Christchurch (an individual),
Syme, Roger William, located at Avonhead, Christchurch (an individual). "Manufacturing nec" (ANZSIC C259907) is the category the ABS issued to Prime Joinery Limited. Our information was updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered | 18 Jul 2017 |
287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & service | 10 May 2018 |
287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8013 | Postal & office & delivery | 27 Apr 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Roger William Syme
Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042
Address used since 07 Apr 2021
Fendalton, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 10 Apr 2013 |
Director | 25 Oct 2002 - current |
David Charles Browne
Christchurch,
Address used since 25 Oct 2002 |
Director | 25 Oct 2002 - 07 May 2008 |
287-293 Durham Street North , Christchurch , 8013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
58 Fendalton Road, Fendalton, Christchurch, 8014 | Physical | 17 Apr 2015 - 10 May 2018 |
30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical | 16 Apr 2015 - 17 Apr 2015 |
30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered | 04 Jun 2014 - 18 Jul 2017 |
58 Fendalton Road, Fendalton, Christchurch, 8014 | Physical | 07 Apr 2014 - 16 Apr 2015 |
58 Fendalton Road, Fendalton, Christchurch, 8014 | Registered | 07 Apr 2014 - 04 Jun 2014 |
94 Disraeli Street, Sydenham, Christchurch, 8023 | Registered & physical | 21 Oct 2013 - 07 Apr 2014 |
C/o Westpac Hub 55 Jack Hinton Drive, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Registered & physical | 15 Jun 2012 - 21 Oct 2013 |
E3 Business Accountants Ltd, Level 4, 10 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch 8011 | Physical & registered | 21 Sep 2009 - 15 Jun 2012 |
Wood Rivers Hawes & Co Ltd, Level 4, 10 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 17 Aug 2007 - 21 Sep 2009 |
462 St Asaph Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 17 May 2007 - 17 Aug 2007 |
Goldsmith Fox P K F, Level 1, 250 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 23 Jun 2006 - 17 May 2007 |
236 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 25 Oct 2002 - 23 Jun 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Meba Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031341370 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Bryndwr Christchurch 8053 |
26 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Syme, Roger William Individual |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 |
22 Dec 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lewis, Craig Brian Individual |
West Melton Christchurch 7676 |
22 Dec 2005 - current |
Syme, Roger William Individual |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 |
25 Oct 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Browne, David Charles Individual |
Christchurch |
25 Oct 2002 - 17 Jan 2006 |
Browne, Sylvia Mary Individual |
Christchurch |
25 Oct 2002 - 17 Jan 2006 |
Lay, Dennis Michael Individual |
Christchurch |
25 Oct 2002 - 17 Jan 2006 |
Westbury, Linda Anne Individual |
R D 1 Porirua |
22 Dec 2005 - 18 May 2017 |
Victoria Trustee Mr Limited 30 Sir William Pickering Drive |
|
A & R A Davoren Trustee Company Limited 30 Sir William Pickering Drive |
|
Georgialeigh Limited 30 Sir William Pickering Drive |
|
Demeter Dairies Limited Partnership Bdo Christchurch Limited |
|
Swpd Trustees Limited Unit 4, 27 Sir William Pickering Drive |
|
Happily Ever After Properties Limited 4/27 Sir William Pickering Drive |
Mcp New Zealand Limited 36 Sir William Pickering Drive |
New Zealand Nutritionals (2015) Limited 17 Sheffield Crescent |
Eastray Enterprises Limited 7 Rutherglen Avenue |
Talvor Motorhomes Limited 24 Logistics Drive |
Artizan Diamond Tools And Equipment Limited 11 Richards Avenue |
Pace Furniture Limited 47c Harris Crescent |