Hvar Investments Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429036352562) was registered on 27 Aug 2002. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 245 Te Puna Road, Rd6, Tauranga, 3176 (type: registered, physical). 50 Bell Street, Judea, Tauranga had been their registered address, up until 30 Nov 2016. Hvar Investments Limited used other aliases, namely: Elite Installations Limited from 27 Aug 2002 to 24 Mar 2009. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Thompson, Eric Roy (an individual) located at Rd6, Tauranga postcode 3176. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Thompson, Leyna Janelle (an individual) - located at Rd 6, Tauranga. Our data was last updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
245 Te Puna Road, Rd6, Tauranga, 3176 | Registered & physical & service | 30 Nov 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Eric Roy Thompson
Rd6, Tauranga, 3176
Address used since 22 Nov 2016 |
Director | 27 Aug 2002 - current |
Leyna Thompson
Rd6, Tauranga, 3176
Address used since 22 Nov 2016 |
Director | 23 Mar 2009 - current |
Vincent Jacobus Van Kuyk
West Harbour, Auckland,
Address used since 27 Aug 2002 |
Director | 27 Aug 2002 - 04 Jul 2003 |
245 Te Puna Road , Rd6 , Tauranga , 3176 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
50 Bell Street, Judea, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical | 02 Dec 2015 - 30 Nov 2016 |
33 Siemonek Rise, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical | 12 Dec 2013 - 02 Dec 2015 |
50 Bell St, Judea, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical | 20 Oct 2011 - 12 Dec 2013 |
46 Allum St, Kohimarama, Auckland | Registered & physical | 30 Oct 2009 - 20 Oct 2011 |
50 Bell St, Judea, Tauranga | Registered & physical | 18 Oct 2006 - 30 Oct 2009 |
Mclaren Guise Associates Limited, Lincoln Manor, 293 Lincoln Road, Waitakere City | Physical & registered | 27 Aug 2002 - 18 Oct 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thompson, Eric Roy Individual |
Rd6 Tauranga 3176 |
27 Aug 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thompson, Leyna Janelle Individual |
Rd 6 Tauranga 3176 |
30 Nov 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Van Kuyk, Vincent Jacobus Individual |
West Harbour Auckland |
28 Nov 2003 - 28 Nov 2003 |
Ritai Limited 5a Paparoa Rd |
|
Seec Limited 4 James Road |
|
W.j. Lochhead Limited 4 James Rd |
|
Lochhead Design Limited 4 James Road |
|
Coolroom Construction Limited 13 James Road |
|
Bay Of Plenty Community Trails Charitable Trust 24 James Road |