Micro Wang Limited (issued a business number of 9429036408955) was incorporated on 19 Jul 2002. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 15 Gerolds Place, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 (type: registered, physical). 12 Cranberry Place, Bucklands Beach, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 23 Apr 2018. Micro Wang Limited used other aliases, namely: Micro Wang Consultant Limited from 19 Jul 2002 to 26 Nov 2006. 10000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 10000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Wang, Liang (an individual) located at Flat Bush, Auckland postcode 2019. "Software development service nec" (ANZSIC M700050) is the category the ABS issued Micro Wang Limited. Our information was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
12 Cranberry Place, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 22 Apr 2013 |
15 Gerolds Place, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 13 Apr 2018 |
15 Gerolds Place, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 | Registered & physical & service | 23 Apr 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Liang Wang
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019
Address used since 01 Apr 2018
Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 15 Apr 2016 |
Director | 19 Jul 2002 - current |
12 Cranberry Place , Bucklands Beach , Auckland , 2012 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
12 Cranberry Place, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 | Registered & physical | 14 Apr 2014 - 23 Apr 2018 |
12 Rapallo Place, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 | Physical & registered | 01 May 2013 - 14 Apr 2014 |
1/7 Rapallo Place, Pakuranga, Auckland | Registered & physical | 25 Mar 2009 - 01 May 2013 |
10 Anna Watson Road, Half Moon Bay, Auckland | Registered & physical | 15 May 2007 - 25 Mar 2009 |
132 Edgewater Dr, Pakuranga, Auckland | Registered | 05 May 2005 - 15 May 2007 |
132 Edgewater Dr, Pakuranga, Auckland, New Zealand | Physical | 05 May 2005 - 15 May 2007 |
5-7 Aranui Road,, Mt Wellington,, Auckland, New Zealand | Registered & physical | 19 Jul 2002 - 05 May 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wang, Liang Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
18 Mar 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wang, Liang Individual |
Pakuranga Auckland, New Zealand |
18 Jun 2004 - 28 Apr 2005 |
Blue Water Trust Company Limited Flat 1, 56 Cherry Road |
|
Gers Services NZ Limited 58 Cherry Road |
|
United Sri Lanka Association "usla (auckland Branch)" Incorporated 382a Bucklands Beach Road |
|
Amadea Holdings Limited 2/26 Cherry Road |
|
Lnz Trustee Limited 32a Cranberry Place |
|
Everest Construction NZ Limited 20 Cherry Road |
Proapps Limited 2/64 Glennandrew Drive |
Slack Solutions Limited 64 Bradbury Road |
Datelstream Limited 12 Proteus Place |
Gngreenvision International Limited 4 Yacht Place |
Nimrod Consulting Limited 9 Nimrod Place |
Process Software (nz) Limited 28 Compass Point Way |