Bell Block Properties Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429036443130) was registered on 17 Jul 2002. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 3080, Fitzroy, New Plymouth, 4341 (type: postal, office). Level 3, 109-113 Powderham Street, New Plymouth had been their registered address, up until 16 Jul 2019. 9990 shares are allotted to 7 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 1110 shares (11.11% of shares), namely:
Coleman, Timothy Robert (an individual) located at Strandon, New Plymouth postcode 4312,
Richards, Bruce Carlaw (an individual) located at Strandon, New Plymouth postcode 4312. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 22.22% of all shares (exactly 2220 shares); it includes
Moller Corporation Limited (an entity) - located at New Plymouth, New Plymouth. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (3330 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Oakura Farms Limited, located at New Plymouth, New Plymouth (an entity). "Rental of commercial property" (business classification L671250) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Bell Block Properties Limited. Our data was updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
113 Gill Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 | Physical & registered & service | 16 Jul 2019 |
Po Box 3080, Fitzroy, New Plymouth, 4341 | Postal | 03 Jul 2020 |
113 Gill Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 | Office & delivery | 03 Jul 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ross David Whitmore
Upper Vogeltown, New Plymouth, 4310
Address used since 25 Mar 2024 |
Director | 25 Mar 2024 - current |
Bruce Norton Moller
Strandon, New Plymouth, 4312
Address used since 25 Mar 2024 |
Director | 25 Mar 2024 - current |
Wesley Stuart Gillanders
Rd 7, Norfolk, 4387
Address used since 25 Mar 2024 |
Director | 25 Mar 2024 - current |
Norton Ross Moller
Oakura, Oakura, 4314
Address used since 01 Jul 2015 |
Director | 17 Jul 2002 - 26 Mar 2024 |
John Gordon Armstrong
Strandon, New Plymouth, 4312
Address used since 01 Jul 2015 |
Director | 17 Jul 2002 - 01 Jul 2019 |
113 Gill Street , New Plymouth , New Plymouth , 4310 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 109-113 Powderham Street, New Plymouth | Registered & physical | 18 Jul 2002 - 16 Jul 2019 |
C/o Staples Rodway, Level 3, 109-113 Powderham Street, New Plymouth | Registered | 17 Jul 2002 - 18 Jul 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Coleman, Timothy Robert Individual |
Strandon New Plymouth 4312 |
25 Mar 2024 - current |
Richards, Bruce Carlaw Individual |
Strandon New Plymouth 4312 |
25 Mar 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Moller Corporation Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039849472 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 |
17 Jul 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Oakura Farms Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039694782 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 |
17 Jul 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Whitmore, Ross David Individual |
Upper Vogeltown New Plymouth 4310 |
25 Mar 2024 - current |
Billings Lawyers Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047035256 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 |
25 Mar 2024 - current |
Armstrong, Helen Mary Individual |
Strandon New Plymouth 4312 |
17 Jul 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Vbw Trustees 2013 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030673908 Company Number: 3815621 Entity |
New Plymouth 4310 |
23 Mar 2017 - 25 Mar 2024 |
Armstrong, John Gordon Individual |
Strandon New Plymouth 4312 |
17 Jul 2002 - 25 Mar 2024 |
Armstrong, John Gordon Individual |
Strandon New Plymouth 4312 |
17 Jul 2002 - 25 Mar 2024 |
Cull, Ian Frederick Individual |
Merrilands New Plymouth 4312 |
15 Jun 2016 - 23 Mar 2017 |
Christian, Donald Individual |
New Plymouth |
17 Jul 2002 - 15 Jun 2016 |
Bbf Limited Level 3, 109-113 Powderham Street |
|
Pjm Welding Limited Law West Law Office |
|
Ararata Holdings Limited Level 3, 109-113 Powderham Street |
|
Hoani Holdings Limited C/-10a Beach Street |
|
Peter & Christine Nicholas Trustees Limited Level 3, 109-113 Powderham Street |
|
Faull Trustee Limited Level 3, 109-113 Powderham Street |
Ermerins Property Holdings Limited 7 Liardet Street |
Westwill Properties Limited 36 Devon Street West |
Jekel Trustee Limited 53 Brougham Street |
Acropolis Holdings Limited 42 Powderham Street |
42 On King Limited 28 Woolcombe Terrace |
Ibr Investments Limited 7 Young Street |