Richmond Forge (Nz) Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429036476930) was incorporated on 29 May 2002. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 23 Muritai Road, R D 4, Whangarei, 0174 (type: physical, registered). 23 Muritai Road, Rd 4, Whangarei had been their registered address, until 18 Aug 2017. Richmond Forge (Nz) Limited used more aliases, namely: Richmond Forge (Nz) Limited from 29 May 2002 to 17 Aug 2005. 25000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 24999 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Warae Group Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Rd 4, Parua Bay postcode 0174. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Bainbridge, Warwick John (an individual) - located at Parua Bay R D 4, Whangarei. "Investment - financial assets" (ANZSIC K624040) is the classification the ABS issued Richmond Forge (Nz) Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 14 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
23 Muritai Road, R D 4, Whangarei, 0174 | Physical & registered & service | 18 Aug 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Warwick John Bainbridge
Rd 4, Whangarei, 0174
Address used since 11 Aug 2016 |
Director | 29 May 2002 - current |
Kevin John Phillips
Rd 7, Inglewood, Taranaki, 4387
Address used since 31 Mar 2006 |
Director | 31 Mar 2006 - 08 Dec 2010 |
23 Muritai Road , R D 4 , Whangarei , 0174 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
23 Muritai Road, Rd 4, Whangarei, 0174 | Registered & physical | 19 Aug 2016 - 18 Aug 2017 |
7 Bella Vista Drive, Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa, 0930 | Registered & physical | 30 Aug 2013 - 19 Aug 2016 |
Walker Wayland Auckland Limited, Level 7, 53 Fort Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 01 Oct 2008 - 30 Aug 2013 |
Bkr Walker Wayland, Level 7, 53 Fort Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 20 Aug 2007 - 01 Oct 2008 |
Mabee Halstead & Kiddle, 4th Floor, Barclay House, 70 Shortland Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 29 May 2002 - 20 Aug 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Warae Group Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038915574 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd 4 Parua Bay 0174 |
29 May 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bainbridge, Warwick John Individual |
Parua Bay R D 4 Whangarei 0174 |
29 May 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Phillips, Kevin John Individual |
Rd 7 Inglewood Taranaki |
07 Jul 2006 - 20 Dec 2010 |
Effective Date | 26 Aug 2022 |
Name | Bct Management Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1727919 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
23 Muritai Road R D 4 Whangarei 0174 |
Formosa Consultancy Services Limited 23 Muritai Road |
|
Barrhead Holdings Limited 23 Muritai Road |
|
Lomic Properties Limited 23 Muritai Road |
|
Jo Hill Designs Limited 29 Muritai Road |
|
Glen Buchanan Holdings Limited 15 Muritai Road |
|
Petty Enterprizez Limited 35 Muritai Road |
Mm Property Investments Limited 13 Mahanga Road |
Entico Trustee Limited Level 4, 35 Robert Street |
Fraser Group Trustees Limited Level 4, 35 Robert Street |
Elevate Ca Trustees 2015 Limited Level 4, 35 Robert Street |
Dalgleish Trustees Limited Level 4, 35 Robert Street |
B & N Robertson Trustees Limited 219 Abbey Caves Road |