Airedale Adventures Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429036495207) was launched on 16 May 2002. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 14 Holmwood Road, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 (type: registered, physical). 2047 Queen Charlotte Drive, Rd 1, Picton had been their registered address, up until 12 Oct 2020. 1 share is issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (100% of shares), namely:
Annand, Ross Alexander Byres (an individual) located at Merivale, Christchurch postcode 8014. Our information was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2047 Queen Charlotte Drive, Rd 1, Picton, 7281 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 29 Oct 2013 |
14 Holmwood Road, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 03 Oct 2020 |
14 Holmwood Road, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 | Registered & physical & service | 12 Oct 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Tiffany Jane Scott
Ilam, Christchurch, 8041
Address used since 01 May 2023
Long Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 03 Oct 2020
Seatoun, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 01 Oct 2015 |
Director | 20 Jun 2002 - current |
Ross Alexander Byres Annand
Merivale, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 03 Oct 2020
Rd 1, Picton, 7281
Address used since 01 Oct 2015 |
Director | 30 Nov 2006 - current |
Thomas Mcneil Pryde
Queenstown,
Address used since 01 Jun 2005 |
Director | 16 May 2002 - 30 Nov 2006 |
14 Holmwood Road , Merivale , Christchurch , 8014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2047 Queen Charlotte Drive, Rd 1, Picton, 7281 | Registered & physical | 06 Nov 2013 - 12 Oct 2020 |
14 Holmwood Road, Merivale, Christchurch 8014 | Registered | 30 Oct 2009 - 06 Nov 2013 |
14 Holmwood Road, Merivale, Christchurch 8014 | Physical | 05 Nov 2007 - 06 Nov 2013 |
14 Holwood Road, Merivale, Christchurch 8014 | Registered | 19 Oct 2007 - 30 Oct 2009 |
50 Garden Road, Fendalton, Christchurch | Registered | 07 Dec 2006 - 19 Oct 2007 |
50 Garden Road, Fendalton, Christchurch | Physical | 07 Dec 2006 - 05 Nov 2007 |
Cruickshank Pryde (attn T Pryde), 42 Don Street, Invercargill | Physical & registered | 16 May 2002 - 07 Dec 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Annand, Ross Alexander Byres Individual |
Merivale Christchurch 8014 |
30 Nov 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pryde, Thomas Mcneil Individual |
Queenstown |
16 May 2002 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Annand & Associates Pty Limited 14 Holmwood Road |
|
Upwood Investments Limited 7 Holmwood Road |
|
Kaiweka Farms Limited 22 Fendalton Road |
|
Sir Roger Clifford Limited 10 Queens Avenue |
|
Michael Hundleby Consultants Limited 1 Queens Avenue |
|
Acheron Station Land Limited 41 Helmores Lane |