P & N Siteworks Limited (issued a business number of 9429036565511) was started on 25 Mar 2002. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 99 Webb Street, Te Aro, Wellington (type: registered, physical). 1000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.1 per cent of shares), namely:
Hosie, James (an individual) located at Wellington. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 99.9 per cent of all shares (999 shares); it includes
Hosie, James (an individual) - located at Wellington,
Gawith, Richard (an individual) - located at Mount Cook, Wellington,
Hosie, Kirsty (an individual) - located at Khandallah, Wellington. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 23 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
99 Webb Street, Te Aro, Wellington | Registered & physical & service | 25 Mar 2002 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
James Hosie
Wellington, 6035
Address used since 16 Feb 2016 |
Director | 16 Aug 2007 - current |
Jamea Hosie
Wellington,
Address used since 25 Mar 2002 |
Director | 25 Mar 2002 - 29 Aug 2007 |
Patrick Seuren
Katikati,
Address used since 01 Sep 2004 |
Director | 25 Mar 2002 - 05 Nov 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hosie, James Individual |
Wellington |
25 Mar 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hosie, James Individual |
Wellington |
25 Mar 2002 - current |
Gawith, Richard Individual |
Mount Cook Wellington 6011 |
07 Feb 2012 - current |
Hosie, Kirsty Individual |
Khandallah Wellington 6035 |
07 Feb 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
P & N Developments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038104381 Company Number: 853621 Entity |
25 Mar 2002 - 05 Sep 2005 | |
P & N Developments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038104381 Company Number: 853621 Entity |
25 Mar 2002 - 05 Sep 2005 | |
Hosie Family Trust, Hosie Family Trust Individual |
Wellington |
25 Mar 2002 - 07 Feb 2012 |
Monastra Q.s. Consultants Limited 99 Webb Street |
|
Second Sphere Limited 99 Webb St |
|
Langdale Management Limited 99 Webb Street |
|
Rdm Properties Limited 99 Webb Street |
|
Terra Rosa Limited 99 Webb Street |
|
Ian Robertson Photography Limited 99 Webb Street |