Abodo Wood Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036582211) was started on 12 Mar 2002. 6 addresess are in use by the company: 62 Ascot Road, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 (type: delivery, physical). L4, 152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland had been their physical address, until 17 Mar 2020. Abodo Wood Limited used other aliases, namely: Access Pacific Limited from 12 Mar 2002 to 27 Aug 2012. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Access Pacific Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Mangere, Auckland postcode 2022. "Timber wholesaling" (ANZSIC F333110) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Abodo Wood Limited. Our database was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
62 Ascot Road, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Delivery & office | 09 Mar 2020 |
Po Box 201136, Auckland Airport, Auckland, 2150 | Postal | 09 Mar 2020 |
62 Ascot Road, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Physical & registered & service | 17 Mar 2020 |
62 Ascot Road, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Delivery | 02 Feb 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Daniel Jon Gudsell
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 27 Feb 2019
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 02 Feb 2015 |
Director | 12 Mar 2002 - current |
John Mcfayden Rae
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 01 Mar 2017 |
Director | 01 Mar 2017 - current |
Gregory John Muir
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 01 Nov 2022 |
Director | 01 Nov 2022 - current |
Noel Keith Gudsell
Maxwell, Whanganui, 4574
Address used since 07 Feb 2017 |
Director | 29 Aug 2003 - 22 Feb 2023 |
Denis Cecil Woods
Otamatea, Wanganui, 4500
Address used since 01 Feb 2012 |
Director | 29 Jan 2009 - 15 Apr 2013 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
62 Ascot Road, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Delivery | 02 Feb 2024 |
62 Ascot Road , Mangere , Auckland , 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
L4, 152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 12 Feb 2016 - 17 Mar 2020 |
Level 4, 152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 31 Jul 2013 - 12 Feb 2016 |
Grant Thornton New Zealand Ltd, Level 4, 152 Fanshawe, Auckland | Registered & physical | 11 Feb 2010 - 31 Jul 2013 |
Level 3, 137 Quay Street, Princes Wharf, Auckland | Registered & physical | 08 Jun 2005 - 11 Feb 2010 |
125 The Strand, Parnell, Auckland | Physical & registered | 08 Jun 2004 - 08 Jun 2005 |
2b Alpers Avenue, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical & registered | 12 Mar 2002 - 08 Jun 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Access Pacific Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032043297 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mangere Auckland 2022 |
10 Dec 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gudsell, Noel Keith Individual |
Maxwell Whanganui 4574 |
02 Feb 2015 - 16 Oct 2019 |
Gudsell, Julie Ann Individual |
Maxwell Whanganui 4574 |
13 Mar 2008 - 16 Oct 2019 |
Waters, Steve Individual |
Maxwell Whanganui 4574 |
13 Mar 2008 - 16 Oct 2019 |
Na & Ja Gudsell Family Trust Other |
30 Aug 2004 - 03 May 2007 | |
Null - Na & Ja Gudsell Family Trust Other |
30 Aug 2004 - 03 May 2007 | |
Gudsell, Daniel Jon Individual |
Rd 4 Wanganui |
31 May 2004 - 03 May 2007 |
Gudsell, Noel Keith Director |
Maxwell Whanganui 4574 |
02 Feb 2015 - 16 Oct 2019 |
Gudsell, Noel Keith Individual |
86 Parnell Rise Parnell, Auckland 1052 |
12 Mar 2002 - 02 Feb 2015 |
Effective Date | 31 Oct 2019 |
Name | Access Pacific Holdings Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 2299724 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
L4, 152 Fanshawe Street Auckland 1010 |
Gummerson Fabrics Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
|
Red Eagle Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
|
Pioneer Capital Ii Nominees Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
|
Pioneer Capital Ii Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
|
Pioneer Capital (gp Ii) Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
|
Epi-use New Zealand Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
Fernwood Products NZ Limited Level 10 34 Shortland Street |
Leaves Only Limited Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace |
Dolman Consultants Limited Level 2, 142 Broadway |
Interior Installations Limited 4 Holdaway Avenue |
Gulf Milling Limited 9 Rautara Street |
Healthking Pacific Limited Flat 1, 49 Ascot Avenue |