Dmi Limited (issued a business number of 9429036636488) was incorporated on 28 Feb 2002. 3 addresses are in use by the company: Po Box 26004, North Avon, Christchurch, 8148 (type: invoice, registered). 170 Mcgregors Road, Linwood, Christchurch, 8062 had been their physical address, until 29 Jul 2013. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Poff, Michael Jeremy (an individual) located at Linwood, Christchurch postcode 8062,
Docherty, Clare Jane (an individual) located at Kilbirnie, Wellington postcode 6022. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Poff, Michael Jeremy (an individual) - located at Linwood, Christchurch. "Computer consultancy service" (ANZSIC M700010) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Dmi Limited. Our data was updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
170 Mcgregors Road, Linwood, Christchurch, 8062 | Physical & registered & service | 29 Jul 2013 |
Po Box 26004, North Avon, Christchurch, 8148 | Invoice | 15 Jul 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael Jeremy Poff
Linwood, Christchurch,, 8062
Address used since 11 Jul 2008 |
Director | 28 Feb 2002 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
170 Mcgregors Road, Linwood, Christchurch, 8062 | Physical & registered | 18 Jul 2008 - 29 Jul 2013 |
170 Mcgregors Road, Linwood, Christchurch 8006 | Physical & registered | 28 Feb 2002 - 18 Jul 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Poff, Michael Jeremy Individual |
Linwood Christchurch 8062 |
28 Feb 2002 - current |
Docherty, Clare Jane Individual |
Kilbirnie Wellington 6022 |
28 Feb 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Poff, Michael Jeremy Individual |
Linwood Christchurch 8062 |
28 Feb 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Walker, Michael Clarence Individual |
Christchurch 8141 |
28 Feb 2002 - 03 Jul 2018 |
Mitchell, Donna Louise Individual |
Saint Martins Christchurch 8022 |
28 Feb 2002 - 05 Jul 2012 |
Avodah Group Limited 42 Rudds Road |
|
Dave Race Properties Limited 9 Merrilees Place |
|
Mcgregor Motorsport & Developments Limited 29 Rudds Road |
|
The Linfield Cultural, Recreational And Sports Club Incorporated Linfield Park |
|
The Sporting Futures Charitable Trust 56 Kearneys Road |
|
The Richmond Keas Softball Club Incorporated 56 Kearneys Road |
Kiffy Systems Limited 7 Windward Lane |
Mgt Solutions Limited 2-16 Brittan Street |
Pc Support Christchurch Limited 417a Breezes Road |
Sentient Research Limited 370 Gloucester Street |
Fazaks Limited 58 Nicholls Street |
The It Dept Limited 17 Warblington Street |