Port Molyneux Dairies Limited (issued a business number of 9429036646319) was started on 31 Jan 2002. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 69 Newcastle Street, Riversdale, 9776 (type: registered, physical). 8 Irwell Street, Gore had been their registered address, up until 28 Jan 2019. 10000 shares are issued to 0 shareholders who belong to 0 shareholder groups. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
69 Newcastle Street, Riversdale, 9776 | Registered & physical & service | 28 Jan 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Katy Jane Button
Rd 1, Balclutha, 9271
Address used since 24 Mar 2011 |
Director | 31 Jan 2002 - current |
Timothy Shaun Button
Rd 1, Balclutha, 9271
Address used since 24 Mar 2011 |
Director | 31 Jan 2002 - current |
Karen Ann Edwards
Rd 2, Tapanui, 9587
Address used since 24 Mar 2011 |
Director | 30 Jun 2006 - 31 Mar 2016 |
Allan Stuart Edwards
Rd 2, Tapanui, 9587
Address used since 24 Mar 2011 |
Director | 30 Jun 2006 - 31 Mar 2016 |
Holmes Byars
Gore,
Address used since 30 Jun 2006 |
Director | 30 Jun 2006 - 02 Apr 2008 |
Johannes Van Der Linden
No 2 Rd, Tapanui,
Address used since 08 Mar 2005 |
Director | 31 Jan 2002 - 30 Jun 2006 |
Elizabeth Anne Van Der Linden
No 2 Rd, Tapanui,
Address used since 08 Mar 2005 |
Director | 31 Jan 2002 - 30 Jun 2006 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
8 Irwell Street, Gore, 9710 | Registered & physical | 10 Jan 2019 - 28 Jan 2019 |
3 Fairfield Street, Gore, Gore, 9710 | Physical & registered | 01 Apr 2011 - 10 Jan 2019 |
Malloch Mcclean, 3 Fairfield Street, Gore | Physical & registered | 06 Jun 2003 - 01 Apr 2011 |
Malloch Mcclean, Fairfield Street, Gore | Registered & physical | 31 Jan 2002 - 06 Jun 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cassidy, Russell James Individual |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 |
10 Jul 2006 - 05 Apr 2016 |
Byars, Peter Alexander Individual |
No 5 Rd Gore |
10 Jul 2006 - 12 Mar 2007 |
Van Der Linden, Elizabeth Anne Individual |
No 2 Rd Tapanui |
31 Jan 2002 - 01 Mar 2006 |
Byars, Raewyn Joy Individual |
Gore |
10 Jul 2006 - 12 Mar 2007 |
Van Der Linden, Johannes Individual |
No 2 Rd Tapanui |
31 Jan 2002 - 01 Mar 2006 |
Van Der Linden, Elizabeth Anne Individual |
No 2 Rd Tapanui |
31 Jan 2002 - 01 Mar 2006 |
Edwards, Allan Stewart Individual |
Rd 2 Tapanui 9587 |
10 Jul 2006 - 05 Apr 2016 |
Button, Timothy Shaun Individual |
Rd 1 Balclutha 9271 |
31 Jan 2002 - 24 Mar 2011 |
Button, Katy Jane Individual |
R D 1 Balclutha |
31 Jan 2002 - 24 Mar 2011 |
Byars, Holmes Individual |
Gore |
10 Jul 2006 - 12 Mar 2007 |
Van Der Linden, Johannes Individual |
No 2 Rd Tapanui |
31 Jan 2002 - 01 Mar 2006 |
Harvie, Douglas James Individual |
Musselburgh Dunedin 9013 |
10 Jul 2006 - 05 Apr 2016 |
Edwards, Karen Ann Individual |
Rd 2 Tapanui 9587 |
10 Jul 2006 - 05 Apr 2016 |
Button, Timothy Shaun Individual |
R D 1 Balclutha |
31 Jan 2002 - 24 Mar 2011 |
Button, Katy Jane Individual |
R D 1 Balclutha |
31 Jan 2002 - 24 Mar 2011 |
Button, Katy Jane Individual |
Rd 1 Balclutha 9271 |
31 Jan 2002 - 24 Mar 2011 |
Fairfield Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037612306 Company Number: 954563 Entity |
31 Jan 2002 - 01 Mar 2006 | |
Button, Timothy Shaun Individual |
Rd 1 Balclutha 9271 |
31 Jan 2002 - 24 Mar 2011 |
Fairfield Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037612306 Company Number: 954563 Entity |
31 Jan 2002 - 01 Mar 2006 |
Bracken Hall Limited 3 Fairfield Street |
|
Milnes Transport Limited 3 Fairfield Street |
|
Genesis Farming South Limited 3 Fairfield Street |
|
Good Shepherd Holdings Limited 3 Fairfield Street |
|
Dairyplus Limited 3 Fairfield Street |
|
Southern Ocean Lobster Limited 3 Fairfield Street |