Top Print Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429036716517) was started on 06 Nov 2001. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 156 Commerce Street, Kaitaia (type: registered, physical). 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Stewart, Rachel Marie (an individual) located at Waipapakauri postcode 0486. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Stewart, John William Matheson (an individual) - located at Pukenui. The Businesscheck information was updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
156 Commerce Street, Kaitaia | Registered & physical & service | 06 Nov 2001 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John William Matheson Stewart
Pukenui, 0484
Address used since 20 Feb 2023
Waipapakauri, 0486
Address used since 27 Feb 2020
R D 1, Kaitaia, 0481
Address used since 09 Feb 2016 |
Director | 06 Nov 2001 - current |
Rachel Marie Stewart
Waipapakauri, 0486
Address used since 20 Feb 2023
Rd1, Kaitaia, 0481
Address used since 09 Feb 2016 |
Director | 08 Apr 2010 - current |
Keith Albert Wagener
Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 06 Nov 2001 |
Director | 06 Nov 2001 - 29 Mar 2010 |
Stanley Day
R D 1, Kaitaia,
Address used since 06 Nov 2001 |
Director | 06 Nov 2001 - 13 Jan 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stewart, Rachel Marie Individual |
Waipapakauri 0486 |
08 Apr 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stewart, John William Matheson Individual |
Pukenui 0484 |
06 Nov 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Day, Stanley Individual |
R D 1 Kaitaia |
06 Nov 2001 - 18 Feb 2005 |
Wagener, Keith Albert Individual |
Remuera Auckland |
06 Nov 2001 - 18 Feb 2005 |
Mauri Tau O Aotearoa Trust 168 Commerce St |
|
Kibs Investment Limited 5 Taaffe Street |
|
Northland Rentals Limited 143 Commerce Street |
|
Family Finance Limited 143 Commerce Street |
|
Archibald Northland Limited 143-5 Commerce Street |
|
Far North R.e.a.p Society Incorporated 33 Puckey Avenue |