Uncle Tom's Limited (NZBN 9429036739172) was started on 26 Oct 2001. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (type: physical, service). C/- Harts, Chartered Accountants, 1St Floor, Westpactrust Building, 19 Wellington Street, Howick, Auckland had been their registered address, until 06 Jan 2003. 1000 shares are allocated to 6 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
May, Joy Dorothy (an individual) located at Pakuranga, Auckland postcode 2010,
May, Ian Grahan (a director) located at Pakuranga, Auckland postcode 2010,
Hgk Trustees (2013) Limited (an entity) located at East Tamaki, Auckland postcode 2013. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 50% of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Mudaliar, Kamlesh (an individual) - located at Daisy Hill, Queensland,
Foo, Gwen Shyong (an individual) - located at Conifer Grove, Auckland,
Lin, Mei-Fang (an individual) - located at Conifer Grove, Takanini. The Businesscheck information was updated on 29 Jun 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Physical & service & registered | 06 Jan 2003 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ian Grahan May
Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 09 Jun 2016 |
Director | 26 Oct 2001 - current |
Gwen Shyong Foo
Conifer Grove, Auckland, 2112
Address used since 26 Oct 2001 |
Director | 26 Oct 2001 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/- Harts, Chartered Accountants, 1st Floor, Westpactrust Building, 19 Wellington Street, Howick, Auckland | Registered & physical | 29 Jul 2002 - 06 Jan 2003 |
Harts, 19 Wellington St, Howick, Auckland | Registered & physical | 26 Oct 2001 - 29 Jul 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
May, Joy Dorothy Individual |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 |
30 May 2017 - current |
May, Ian Grahan Director |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 |
30 May 2017 - current |
Hgk Trustees (2013) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030225060 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
East Tamaki Auckland 2013 |
30 May 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mudaliar, Kamlesh Individual |
Daisy Hill Queensland 4127 |
06 Aug 2010 - current |
Foo, Gwen Shyong Individual |
Conifer Grove Auckland |
26 Oct 2001 - current |
Lin, Mei-fang Individual |
Conifer Grove Takanini 2112 |
06 Aug 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
May, William Alan Individual |
R D 4 Pukekohe |
14 Jun 2005 - 30 May 2017 |
May, Ian Grahan Individual |
Pakuranga |
26 Oct 2001 - 14 Jun 2005 |
Trow, David Keith Individual |
Rd 4 Pukekohe |
14 Jun 2005 - 30 May 2017 |
R & R Quality Products Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
Flowerpak 2005 Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
Fresh To Go Limited Level 2, 116 Harris Road |
|
Spraggon Marketing Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
NZ Good Food Co. Limited Level 2, Bdo House, 116 Harris Road, |
|
Elite Garage Doors Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |