Debtworks (Nz) Limited (issued a business number of 9429036760077) was registered on 15 Oct 2001. 7 addresess are in use by the company: Level 1, 91 Central Park Drive, Henderson, Auckland City, 0610 (type: office, delivery). Level 1, 1-3 Rhone Avenue, Te Atatu Peninsula, Auckland City had been their registered address, until 25 Feb 2014. 30000 shares are allocated to 10 shareholders who belong to 6 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 4985 shares (16.62 per cent of shares), namely:
Devoy, Martin Gerard (an individual) located at Papakura, Auckland postcode 2113,
Devoy, Marie Elizabeth (an individual) located at Mt Eden, Auckland postcode 1024. When considering the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 49.8 per cent of all shares (exactly 14940 shares); it includes
Samusamuvodre, Lisa Rosalia Ana (an individual) - located at Waimauku, Auckland,
Cross, Diane Louise (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Waimauku,
Cross, Bruce Laurence (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Waimauku. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (30 shares, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Cross, Diane Louise, located at Rd 1, Waimauku (an individual). "Collection agency service" (business classification N729310) is the category the ABS issued Debtworks (Nz) Limited. Our data was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 91 Central Park Drive, Henderson, Auckland, 0610 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 17 Feb 2014 |
Level 1, 91 Central Park Drive, Henderson, Auckland City, 0610 | Registered & physical & service | 25 Feb 2014 |
Level 1, 91 Central Park Drive, Henderson, Auckland City, 0610 | Office & delivery | 26 Sep 2019 |
P O Box 104029, Lincoln North, Auckland, 0654 | Postal | 26 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bruce Laurence Cross
Rd 1, Waimauku, 0881
Address used since 01 Sep 2020
Huapai, Kumeu, 0810
Address used since 24 Sep 2014 |
Director | 15 Oct 2001 - current |
Leyden Patrick Tolhurst
Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 20 Feb 2014 |
Director | 20 Feb 2014 - current |
David James Young
Dunedin, 9011
Address used since 15 Jul 2010 |
Director | 22 Sep 2003 - 06 Oct 2017 |
Michael William Tolhurst
Riverhead, Riverhead, 0820
Address used since 21 Oct 2013 |
Director | 02 May 2002 - 19 Feb 2014 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
P O Box 104029, Lincoln North, Auckland, 0654 | Postal | 26 Sep 2019 |
Level 1, 91 Central Park Drive , Henderson , Auckland City , 0610 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 1-3 Rhone Avenue, Te Atatu Peninsula, Auckland City, 0610 | Registered & physical | 18 Sep 2012 - 25 Feb 2014 |
Level 1, 1-3 Rhone Avenue, Te Atatue Penisula, Auckland City, 0610 | Registered & physical | 23 Jul 2010 - 18 Sep 2012 |
Administrator House, Level 6, 44 Anzac Ave, Auckland City | Registered & physical | 27 Jun 2005 - 23 Jul 2010 |
Level 5, 17 Albert Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 27 Mar 2002 - 27 Jun 2005 |
91 Kemp Road, Massey, Auckland | Physical & registered | 15 Oct 2001 - 27 Mar 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Devoy, Martin Gerard Individual |
Papakura Auckland 2113 |
20 Feb 2014 - current |
Devoy, Marie Elizabeth Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 |
15 Oct 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Samusamuvodre, Lisa Rosalia Ana Individual |
Waimauku Auckland 0881 |
24 Sep 2008 - current |
Cross, Diane Louise Individual |
Rd 1 Waimauku 0881 |
15 Oct 2001 - current |
Cross, Bruce Laurence Individual |
Rd 1 Waimauku 0881 |
15 Oct 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cross, Diane Louise Individual |
Rd 1 Waimauku 0881 |
15 Oct 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cross, Bruce Laurence Individual |
Rd 1 Waimauku 0881 |
15 Oct 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Devoy, Marie Elizabeth Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 |
15 Oct 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Devoy, Marie Elizabeth Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 |
15 Oct 2001 - current |
Tolhurst, Leyden Patrick Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 |
20 Feb 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tolhurst, Michael William Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 |
15 Oct 2001 - 20 Feb 2014 |
Tolhurst, Michael William Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 |
15 Oct 2001 - 20 Feb 2014 |
Young, Felicity Jane Individual |
Belleknowes Dunedin 9011 |
07 Aug 2017 - 06 Oct 2017 |
Tolhurst, Michael William Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 |
15 Oct 2001 - 20 Feb 2014 |
Young, Felicity Individual |
Belleknowes Dunedin 9011 |
10 Sep 2004 - 07 Aug 2017 |
Bellamy, Philip James Individual |
Belleknowes Dunedin 9011 |
07 Aug 2017 - 06 Oct 2017 |
Young, David James Individual |
Belleknowes Dunedin 9011 |
10 Sep 2004 - 06 Oct 2017 |
Young, Felicity Jane Individual |
Belleknowes Dunedin 9011 |
07 Aug 2017 - 06 Oct 2017 |
Bellamny, Philip James Individual |
Belleknowes Dunedin 9011 |
24 Sep 2008 - 07 Aug 2017 |
Young, David James Individual |
Belleknowes Dunedin 9011 |
10 Sep 2004 - 06 Oct 2017 |
Onehunga Dental Limited Unit C, Level 1, 199 Lincoln Road |
|
Apna Television Limited Level 3, 362 Great North Road |
|
Sri Mahalaksmi Limited Unit C, Level 1, 199 Lincoln Road |
|
32 Milestone New Zealand Limited Unit C, Level 1, 199 Lincoln Road |
|
Sweety And Markus Holdings Limited Unit C, Level 1, 199 Lincoln Road |
|
The Insurance Supply Co Limited Level 1, 3 Rhone Avenue |
Creditbiz Limited Level 1 91 Central Park Drive |
The Tenancy Practice Service Limited C/o Corban Revell |
Debtbiz Limited Level 1, 91 Central Park Drive |
Specialist Collections & Consultants Limited 24 Veronica Street |
Debtorcorp NZ Limited 11 Edinburgh Street |
Lion Finance Limited 18 Viaduct Harbour Avenue |