Boxhill Brokers Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429036875344) was started on 15 Jun 2001. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 485A Otaki Gorge Road, Otaki, 5582 (type: physical, registered). 32 The Terrece, Wellington had been their registered address, until 16 Nov 2018. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Beddie, Sothea (a director) located at Otaki postcode 5582,
Beddie, Alan Lawson (an individual) located at Otaki postcode 5582. The Businesscheck data was updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
485a Otaki Gorge Road, Otaki, 5582 | Other (Address For Share Register) & records & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 08 Nov 2018 |
485a Otaki Gorge Road, Otaki, 5582 | Physical & registered & service | 16 Nov 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alan Lawson Beddie
Otaki, 5582
Address used since 08 Nov 2018
32 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 17 Nov 2010 |
Director | 15 Jun 2001 - current |
Sothea Beddie
Otaki, 5582
Address used since 17 May 2021 |
Director | 17 May 2021 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
32 The Terrece, Wellington | Registered & physical | 19 May 2009 - 16 Nov 2018 |
C/o Alan Beddie, Bolton Apartments/bolton Hotel, 12 Bolton Steet, The Terrece, Wellington | Registered | 24 Jan 2008 - 19 May 2009 |
C/o Alan Beddie, Bolton Apartments/bolton Hotel, 12 Bolton Str, The Terrece, Wellington | Physical | 24 Jan 2008 - 19 May 2009 |
Level 6, 95 Custom House Quay, Wellington | Physical & registered | 17 Jun 2003 - 24 Jan 2008 |
Level 5, Todd Building, Cnr Lambton Quay & Brandon Streets, Wellington | Physical & registered | 15 Jun 2001 - 17 Jun 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Beddie, Sothea Director |
Otaki 5582 |
24 May 2021 - current |
Beddie, Alan Lawson Individual |
Otaki 5582 |
15 Jun 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Walshaw, David John Individual |
Te Horo 5581 |
15 Jun 2001 - 08 Oct 2022 |
Walshaw, David John Individual |
Te Horo 5581 |
15 Jun 2001 - 08 Oct 2022 |
Btc Trustees 2012 Limited 32 The Terrace |
|
Btc Trustees 2011 Limited 32 The Terrace |
|
Btc Trustees 2010 Limited 32 The Terrace |
|
Brandons Trustees 2010 Limited 32 The Terrace |
|
Brandons Trustees 2009 Limited 32 The Terrace |
|
Key Property 007 Limited 32 The Terrace |