Cove Investments Limited (NZBN 9429036911141) was incorporated on 25 May 2001. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 108 Whitaker Street, Te Aroha, Te Aroha, 3320 (type: physical, service). 4A Swinton Close, Remuera, Auckland had been their registered address, until 22 May 2018. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Dowe, Robin Matthew (an individual) located at Te Aroha, Te Aroha postcode 3320. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Crawford, Glenys Lorraine (an individual) - located at Te Aroha, Te Aroha. "Forestry" (ANZSIC A030120) is the classification the ABS issued Cove Investments Limited. Our information was updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
108 Whitaker Street, Te Aroha, Te Aroha, 3320 | Physical & service & registered | 22 May 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Robin Matthew Dowe
Te Aroha, Te Aroha, 3320
Address used since 14 May 2018
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 26 Mar 2008 |
Director | 25 May 2001 - current |
Glenys Lorraine Crawford
Te Aroha, Te Aroha, 3320
Address used since 14 May 2018
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 26 Mar 2008 |
Director | 25 May 2001 - current |
Stephen Robert Thom
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 09 Dec 2010 |
Director | 25 May 2001 - 29 Jun 2011 |
Tracey Marie Filleul
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 09 Dec 2010 |
Director | 25 May 2001 - 29 Jun 2011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4a Swinton Close, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Registered & physical | 19 Oct 2015 - 22 May 2018 |
4a Swinton Close, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Physical | 18 Oct 2011 - 19 Oct 2015 |
Earthstar Chartered Accountants Ltd, Level 1, 233 Dairy Flat Highway, Albany Village, Auckland, 0632 | Physical | 17 Dec 2010 - 18 Oct 2011 |
Level 1, 233 Dairy Flat Highway, Albany Village, Auckland, 0632 | Registered | 17 Dec 2010 - 19 Oct 2015 |
Earthstar Chartered Accountants Ltd, Level 1, 233 State Highway 17, Albany Village, Auckland | Physical & registered | 03 Dec 2002 - 17 Dec 2010 |
Herbke Accounting Services, 235 State Highway 17, Albany Village, Auckland | Physical & registered | 25 May 2001 - 03 Dec 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dowe, Robin Matthew Individual |
Te Aroha Te Aroha 3320 |
25 May 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Crawford, Glenys Lorraine Individual |
Te Aroha Te Aroha 3320 |
25 May 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thom, Stephen Robert Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
25 May 2001 - 01 Jul 2011 |
Filleul, Tracey Marie Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
25 May 2001 - 01 Jul 2011 |
Feedback Limited 2a Swinton Close |
|
Sourcecode Trust 8 Swinton Close |
|
Talk Communications Limited 52 Bassett Road |
|
Gateway Corporation Limited 22 Ely Avenue |
|
The Eynon Trustee Limited 23a Ely Avenue |
|
St A Trustee Limited 23a Ely Avenue |
Bradshaw Forest Limited 4 Maui Grove |
Durham Forest Limited 79 Seaview Road |
Pure Logging (taupo) Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
Hoko Investments Limited 30a Bell Road |
Starbrook Properties Limited 1st Floor, 24 Manukau Road |
Starling Developments Limited 1st Floor 24 Manukau Road |