Ten Pin Tauranga Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429036955077) was incorporated on 27 Mar 2001. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 60 Durham Street, Tauranga, 3110 (type: physical, registered). 7 Totara Street, Mount Maunganui had been their registered address, up to 20 Oct 2021. 20000 shares are allocated to 6 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 200 shares (1% of shares), namely:
Stretton, Rebecca (an individual) located at Tauranga South, Tauranga postcode 3112. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 49% of all shares (exactly 9800 shares); it includes
Nikki Burley Trustees (2004) Limited (an entity) - located at 41 Monmouth Street, Tauranga,
Stretton, Rebecca (an individual) - located at Tauranga South, Tauranga. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (9800 shares, 49%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Stretton, Mark Bryan, located at Tauranga South, Tauranga (an individual),
Lloyd & Associates 2012 Limited, located at 60 Durham Street, Tauranga (an entity). Our database was updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7 Totara Street, Mount Maunganui, 3116 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 15 Oct 2012 |
60 Durham Street, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered & service | 20 Oct 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Bryan Stretton
Tauranga South, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 01 Oct 2010 |
Director | 17 Aug 2005 - current |
Rebecca Stretton
Tauranga South, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 01 Oct 2010 |
Director | 30 Apr 2008 - current |
Kenneth Albert Walter
Rd3 Oropi, Tauranga,
Address used since 01 Apr 2005 |
Director | 27 Mar 2001 - 14 Apr 2008 |
Deborah Kristine Stretton
Tauranga,
Address used since 17 Aug 2005 |
Director | 17 Aug 2005 - 01 Mar 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
7 Totara Street, Mount Maunganui, 3116 | Registered & physical | 18 Dec 2020 - 20 Oct 2021 |
1181 Cameron Road, Gate Pa, Tauranga, 3112 | Registered & physical | 22 Sep 2020 - 18 Dec 2020 |
7 Totara Street, Mount Maunganui, 3116 | Registered & physical | 24 Oct 2012 - 22 Sep 2020 |
C/-grace Team Accounting Limited, 556 Cameron Road, Tauranga | Physical & registered | 15 Jan 2009 - 24 Oct 2012 |
C/-markhams Mri Auckland Ltd, Level 10, Q&v Building, 203 Queen Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 16 Dec 2005 - 15 Jan 2009 |
353 Devonport Road, Tauranga | Registered & physical | 16 Apr 2003 - 16 Dec 2005 |
135 13th Ave, Tauranga | Registered | 30 Jul 2002 - 16 Apr 2003 |
45 Thirlwall Lane, Cambridge | Physical | 27 Mar 2001 - 27 Mar 2001 |
135 13th Ave, Tauranga | Physical | 27 Mar 2001 - 16 Apr 2003 |
45 Thirlwall Lane, Cambridge | Registered | 27 Mar 2001 - 30 Jul 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stretton, Rebecca Individual |
Tauranga South Tauranga 3112 |
06 Oct 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nikki Burley Trustees (2004) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035401483 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
41 Monmouth Street Tauranga 3141 |
02 May 2008 - current |
Stretton, Rebecca Individual |
Tauranga South Tauranga 3112 |
02 May 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stretton, Mark Bryan Individual |
Tauranga South Tauranga 3112 |
12 Sep 2006 - current |
Lloyd & Associates 2012 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031155724 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
60 Durham Street Tauranga 3110 |
30 May 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stretton, Mark Bryan Individual |
Tauranga South Tauranga 3112 |
12 Sep 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stretton, Deborah Kristine Individual |
Tauranga |
12 Sep 2006 - 12 Sep 2006 |
Htt 2008 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032939149 Company Number: 2086996 Entity |
21 Oct 2010 - 30 May 2013 | |
Walter, Kenneth Albert Individual |
R D 3 Oropi, Tauranga |
27 Mar 2001 - 09 Dec 2005 |
Walter, Lorraine Suzette Individual |
R D 3 Oropi, Tauranga |
27 Mar 2001 - 09 Dec 2005 |
Htt 2008 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032939149 Company Number: 2086996 Entity |
21 Oct 2010 - 30 May 2013 |
Waimanalo Limited 7 Totara Street |
|
Bj & Kl Properties Limited 7 Totara Street |
|
Gokidgo Limited 7 Totara Street |
|
J B Lloyd Chartered Accountants Limited 7 Totara Street |
|
Waikato Vehicle Leasing Limited 7 Totara Street |
|
Burgess Construction Limited 7 Totara Street |