Kaipara Produce Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036977253) was started on 21 Mar 2001. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: 8 Tullamore Lane Maunu, Whangarei, 0110 (type: registered, registered). 6A Vinery Lane, Whangarei had been their registered address, up to 14 Feb 2020. Kaipara Produce Limited used more aliases, namely: A. Blundell Limited from 21 Feb 2003 to 25 Feb 2003, Kaipara Kumara Limited (21 Mar 2001 to 21 Feb 2003). 10 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 10 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Kaipara Kumara Limited (an entity) located at Rd 3, Whangarei postcode 0110. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
228 Matapouri Road, Rd 3, Whangarei, 0173 | Registered | 14 Feb 2020 |
228 Matapouri Road, Rd 3, Whangarei, 0173 | Physical & service | 18 Feb 2021 |
8 Tullamore, Maunu, Whangarei, 0110 | Records | 31 Oct 2023 |
8 Tullamore Lane Maunu, Rd 3, Whangarei, 0110 | Registered | 08 Nov 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Anthony Charles Blundell
Rd 1, Ruawai, 0591
Address used since 22 Feb 2010 |
Director | 01 Sep 2002 - current |
James Leonard Simpson
Rd 1, Ruawai, 0591
Address used since 20 Jan 2015 |
Director | 01 Sep 2002 - current |
Ivan Edsel Reed
Maunu, Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 04 Feb 2016 |
Director | 01 Sep 2002 - current |
John Nilsson
Dargaville Rd7,
Address used since 01 Sep 2002 |
Director | 01 Sep 2002 - 01 Jul 2003 |
John James Nilsson
Baylys Beach,
Address used since 30 Aug 2002 |
Director | 30 Aug 2002 - 30 Oct 2002 |
Anthony Charles Blundell
Ruawai,
Address used since 30 Aug 2002 |
Director | 30 Aug 2002 - 30 Oct 2002 |
Ivan Edsel Reed
Taranaki,
Address used since 30 Aug 2002 |
Director | 30 Aug 2002 - 30 Oct 2002 |
James Leonard Simpson
Ruawai,
Address used since 30 Aug 2002 |
Director | 30 Aug 2002 - 30 Oct 2002 |
Gary Frederick Blundell
Ruawai 0586,
Address used since 21 Mar 2001 |
Director | 21 Mar 2001 - 30 Aug 2002 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
8 Tullamore Lane Maunu, Rd 3, Whangarei, 0110 | Registered | 08 Nov 2023 |
24 Finlayson Street, Whangarei, Whangarei, 0110 | Service | 08 Nov 2023 |
8 Tullamore Lane Maunu, Whangarei, 0110 | Registered | 15 Feb 2024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
6a Vinery Lane, Whangarei, 0110 | Registered | 26 Feb 2015 - 14 Feb 2020 |
6a Vinery Lane, Whangarei | Physical | 06 Oct 2003 - 18 Feb 2021 |
Jellicoe Rd, Ruawai 0586 | Registered | 06 Nov 2002 - 26 Feb 2015 |
Po Box 26, Ruawai 0586 | Physical | 06 Nov 2002 - 06 Oct 2003 |
68 Freyberg Road, Ruawai 0586 | Physical & registered | 21 Mar 2001 - 06 Nov 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kaipara Kumara Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429000035415 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd 3 Whangarei 0110 |
21 Mar 2001 - current |
Glen Jenyns Contracting Limited 6a Vinery Lane |
|
Ngati-hine Forestry Charitable Trust 6 Vinery Lane |
|
S&e Retirement Limited 6a Vinery Lane |
|
Hineora Limited 6 Vinery Lane |
|
Anson Estate Limited Gunson Mclean |
|
Rural Skyline Limited Gunson Mclean |