Midland Packers Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429037040291) was started on 03 Jan 2001. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 23 Wallace Street, Motueka, 7120 (type: registered, physical). 23 Wallace Street, Motueka, Motueka had been their registered address, up until 14 Jul 2021. 4500 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 4500 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Hansen, Peter Thomas (an individual) located at Rd 2, Upper Moutere postcode 7175. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 05 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
23 Wallace Street, Motueka, 7120 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Jul 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Thomas Hansen
Patons Rock, Takaka, 7182
Address used since 01 Jul 2015
Rd 2, Upper Moutere, 7175
Address used since 01 Jul 2015 |
Director | 03 Jan 2001 - current |
Ross Erik Hansen
Rd 2, Upper Moutere, 7175
Address used since 03 Jul 2009 |
Director | 03 Jan 2001 - 02 Jun 2011 |
Melvyn Poul Hansen
Rd 2, Upper Moutere,
Address used since 03 Jan 2001 |
Director | 03 Jan 2001 - 30 Jun 2005 |
John Hansen
Motueka,
Address used since 03 Jan 2001 |
Director | 03 Jan 2001 - 11 Feb 2005 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
23 Wallace Street, Motueka, Motueka, 7120 | Registered & physical | 02 Aug 2018 - 14 Jul 2021 |
23 Wallace Street, Motueka, Motueka, 7120 | Registered & physical | 27 Jul 2016 - 02 Aug 2018 |
23 Wallace Street, Motueka, 7120 | Physical & registered | 10 Jul 2009 - 27 Jul 2016 |
C/-john Murphy & Associates Ltd, 23 Wallace Street, Motueka | Registered & physical | 16 Oct 2005 - 10 Jul 2009 |
C/-brown & Associates, Chartered Accountants, 23 Wallace Street, Motueka | Registered & physical | 16 May 2005 - 16 Oct 2005 |
Milnes Beatson & Associates, 29 Wallace Street, Motueka | Registered & physical | 03 Jan 2001 - 16 May 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hansen, Peter Thomas Individual |
Rd 2 Upper Moutere 7175 |
27 Jul 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hansen, Poul Individual |
Motueka |
03 Jan 2001 - 27 Jul 2004 |
Hansen, Ross Erik Individual |
Rd 2 Upper Moutere 7175 |
03 Jan 2001 - 02 Jun 2011 |
Midland Packers Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037040291 Company Number: 1109647 Entity |
Motueka Motueka 7120 |
02 Jun 2011 - 20 May 2019 |
Midland Packers Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037040291 Company Number: 1109647 Entity |
Motueka Motueka 7120 |
02 Jun 2011 - 20 May 2019 |
Hansen, Heidi Erin Laurice Individual |
Motueka |
03 Jan 2001 - 27 Jul 2004 |
Hansen, Melvyn Poul Individual |
Rd 2 Upper Moutere |
03 Jan 2001 - 11 May 2005 |
Hansen, Poul Individual |
Braeburn, R D 2 Upper Moutere |
21 Jul 2005 - 13 Jul 2006 |
Hansen, John Individual |
Lower Moutere Rd 2, Upper Moutere |
03 Jan 2001 - 27 Jul 2004 |
Hansen, Esme Grace Individual |
Motueka |
03 Jan 2001 - 27 Jul 2004 |
Mickar Holdings Limited 23 Wallace Street |
|
Ponty's Place Limited 23 Wallace Street |
|
Smart Business Centre Motueka Limited 23 Wallace Street |
|
Tasman Bays Promotions Association Incorporated C/-motueka Visitor Information Centre |
|
Motueka Events Charitable Trust 20 Wallace Street |
|
Weingut Seifried Limited 29 Wallace Street |