Howick Liquor Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429037181512) was registered on 10 Aug 2000. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: Po Box 38476, Howick, Auckland, 2145 (type: postal, office). Cnr Elliott & Moore Streets, Howick had been their physical address, up to 06 Apr 2010. 1000 shares are allocated to 6 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 448 shares (44.8% of shares), namely:
Rameka, Gwen Rangimarama (a director) located at Bucklands Beach, Manukau postcode 2014,
Davenports City Law Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Ponsonby, Auckland postcode 1011. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 54.8% of all shares (exactly 548 shares); it includes
Granger, Joycelyn Margaret (an individual) - located at Bucklands Beach, Auckland,
Davenports City Law Trustee Limited (an entity) - located at Ponsonby, Auckland. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allocation (2 shares, 0.2%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Rameka, Gwen Rangimarama, located at Bucklands Beach, Manukau (a director). "Liquor store" (ANZSIC G412310) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Howick Liquor Limited. Our information was updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
125 Elliot Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 | Physical & service & registered | 06 Apr 2010 |
Po Box 38476, Howick, Auckland, 2145 | Postal | 30 Mar 2020 |
125 Elliot Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 | Office & delivery | 30 Mar 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gwen Rangimarama Rameka
Bucklands Beach, Manukau, 2014
Address used since 26 Mar 2010 |
Director | 10 Aug 2000 - current |
Joycelyn Granger
Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 10 Sep 2012 |
Director | 10 Sep 2012 - current |
Selwyn Clive Granger
Bucklands Beach, Manukau, 2014
Address used since 26 Mar 2010 |
Director | 10 Aug 2000 - 22 Jun 2012 |
Howard Hill
Richmond, Nelson,
Address used since 20 Oct 2005 |
Director | 10 Aug 2000 - 12 Jul 2006 |
Thomas Ritchie Maguigan
Maungatapu, Tauranga,
Address used since 31 May 2006 |
Director | 30 Sep 2002 - 12 Jul 2006 |
Louis Anthony Fox
Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 17 Jul 2001 |
Director | 17 Jul 2001 - 30 Sep 2002 |
David Gerard O'connell
Whitford,
Address used since 10 Aug 2000 |
Director | 10 Aug 2000 - 29 Jun 2001 |
125 Elliot Street , Howick , Auckland , 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Cnr Elliott & Moore Streets, Howick | Physical | 31 Mar 2003 - 06 Apr 2010 |
Cnr Elliot & Moore Streets, Howick | Registered | 31 Mar 2003 - 06 Apr 2010 |
Po Box 38476, Howick, Auckland | Registered | 03 Apr 2002 - 31 Mar 2003 |
Corner Elliot & Moore Streets, Howick, Auckland | Registered | 01 Nov 2001 - 03 Apr 2002 |
Corner Elliot & Moore Streets, Howick, Auckland | Physical | 10 Aug 2000 - 31 Mar 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rameka, Gwen Rangimarama Director |
Bucklands Beach Manukau 2014 |
06 Dec 2010 - current |
Davenports City Law Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034793633 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Ponsonby Auckland 1011 |
06 Dec 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Granger, Joycelyn Margaret Individual |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2014 |
06 Dec 2010 - current |
Davenports City Law Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034793633 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Ponsonby Auckland 1011 |
06 Dec 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rameka, Gwen Rangimarama Director |
Bucklands Beach Manukau 2014 |
06 Dec 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Granger, Joycelyn Margaret Individual |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2014 |
06 Dec 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Granger, Selwyn Clive Individual |
Bucklands Beach Manukau 2014 |
06 Dec 2010 - 19 Mar 2013 |
NZ Liquor Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031994705 Company Number: 121736 Entity |
10 Aug 2000 - 31 Mar 2006 | |
Granger, Selwyn Clive Individual |
Howick Auckland |
10 Aug 2000 - 06 Dec 2010 |
Selwyn Clive Granger Director |
Bucklands Beach Manukau 2014 |
06 Dec 2010 - 19 Mar 2013 |
NZ Liquor Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031994705 Company Number: 121736 Entity |
10 Aug 2000 - 31 Mar 2006 | |
Rameka, Gwen Rangimarama Individual |
Howick Auckland |
10 Aug 2000 - 06 Dec 2010 |
Off The Fringe Organic Hair Studio Limited Unit 1c 121elliot Street |
|
Blackmyr Wu Limited Unit 2, 121 Elliot Street |
|
Freshwater Technologies NZ Limited 167 Moore St |
|
Howick Marine Motors And Accessories Limited 2/115 Elliot Street |
|
See Inside Limited Unit 9, 115 Elliot Street |
|
Digital Mix Corporate Video Production Limited Unit 6, 115 Elliot Street |
Deyuda Limited Unit L /113 Meadowland Driver |
Tj Sharma Limited 1 Dana Place |
Kk 2014 Limited 17 Chale Place |
Ravra Holdings Limited 10 Haven Crest |
NZ Flourish Limited 14/29 Aviemore Drive |
Naughty Stone Limited 29 Copperfield Terrace |