Oakway Trustee Services Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037233242) was incorporated on 09 Jun 2000. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 270 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, 270 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch had been their physical address, up to 30 Jun 2021. Oakway Trustee Services Limited used other names, namely: Taurus 24 Limited from 09 Jun 2000 to 24 Jan 2001. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Oakway Trustee Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch postcode 8011. Businesscheck's data was updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 270 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical & service | 30 Jun 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alan Bruce Calder
86 Springfield Road, Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 08 Sep 2009 |
Director | 09 Jun 2000 - current |
Adam Brent Coleman
Devonport, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 16 Apr 2024
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 12 May 2021
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 01 Sep 2020
Lincoln, Lincoln, 7608
Address used since 10 Jan 2020 |
Director | 10 Jan 2020 - current |
Joanne Mcmaster-finch
Rd 4, Christchurch, 7674
Address used since 01 Jul 2021 |
Director | 01 Jul 2021 - current |
Merryn Anne O'malley
Rd 6, Prebbleton, 7676
Address used since 01 Jul 2021 |
Director | 01 Jul 2021 - current |
Bushi Lu
Greenlane, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 14 Mar 2023 |
Director | 14 Mar 2023 - current |
Geoffrey David Angus
Prebbleton, Christchurch, 7604
Address used since 01 Sep 2003 |
Director | 09 Jun 2000 - 26 Apr 2023 |
Zara Katherine Tonks
Addington, Christchurch, 8024
Address used since 12 May 2021
Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042
Address used since 23 Jan 2020 |
Director | 10 Jan 2020 - 30 Sep 2021 |
Errol Wayne Bailey
Papanui, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 01 Sep 2010 |
Director | 09 Jun 2000 - 01 Jul 2021 |
Paul Henry Wouters
Fendalton, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 05 Nov 2010 |
Director | 05 Nov 2010 - 10 Jan 2020 |
Michael Thomas Kohing
Christchurch, 8025
Address used since 01 Sep 2015 |
Director | 30 Oct 2001 - 01 Oct 2019 |
David Ronald Kitson
Kennedys Bush, Christchurch, 8025
Address used since 12 Nov 2015 |
Director | 15 Aug 2007 - 01 Oct 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 270 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical & registered | 05 Apr 2019 - 30 Jun 2021 |
Level 1, 22 Foster Street, Addington,, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical | 06 Apr 2011 - 05 Apr 2019 |
Taurus Group Limited, Level 3, Urs House, 287 Durham Street, Christchurch 8011 | Registered & physical | 15 Sep 2009 - 06 Apr 2011 |
Level 3, Landsborough House, 287 Durham Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 09 Jun 2000 - 15 Sep 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Oakway Trustee Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048394321 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 |
30 Jun 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Taurus Accounting Solutions Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037371340 Company Number: 1014028 Entity |
09 Jun 2000 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Kuamate Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032662696 Company Number: 2150201 Entity |
20 Oct 2008 - 30 Jun 2020 | |
Kuamate Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032662696 Company Number: 2150201 Entity |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 |
20 Oct 2008 - 30 Jun 2020 |
Taurus Gold (2008) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033521398 Company Number: 1922717 Entity |
15 Aug 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Taurus Gold Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037370756 Company Number: 1014061 Entity |
22 Aug 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Taurus Gold (2008) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033521398 Company Number: 1922717 Entity |
15 Aug 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Taurus Accounting Solutions Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037371340 Company Number: 1014028 Entity |
09 Jun 2000 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Taurus Gold Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037370756 Company Number: 1014061 Entity |
22 Aug 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Effective Date | 28 Jun 2020 |
Name | Oakway Trustee Holdings Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 8039319 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Level 1, 270 St Asaph Street Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 |
Leighs Cockram Jv Limited Level 2, 219 High Street |
|
Reardon Holdings Limited Level 2, 205 Durham Street South |
|
Dravitzki Trustees Limited Level 2, 14 Dundas Street |
|
Delwyn Denton-lanauze Trustee Limited Level 2, 14 Dundas Street |
|
Manning Trustees Limited Level 2, 14 Dundas Street |
|
Ah Trust Co Limited Level 2, 14 Dundas Street |