Flagz Group Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429037253394) was registered on 19 May 2000. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 642 Great South Road, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 (type: physical, registered). Level 12, 126 Vincent St, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 10 Nov 2011. Flagz Group Limited used other names, namely: Flags International Nz Limited from 02 Jun 2000 to 04 Dec 2003, Perendale Limited (19 May 2000 to 02 Jun 2000). 200 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 96 shares (48% of shares), namely:
Brown, Inge Barbara (an individual) located at Mount Roskill, Auckland postcode 1041,
Brown, Shane Anthony (an individual) located at Mount Roskill, Auckland postcode 1041. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 2% of all shares (4 shares); it includes
Brown, Inge Barbara (an individual) - located at Mount Roskill, Auckland. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (4 shares, 2%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Brown, Shane Anthony, located at Mount Roskill, Auckland (an individual). Businesscheck's data was last updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
642 Great South Road, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 | Physical & registered & service | 10 Nov 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Shane Anthony Brown
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 13 Apr 2015 |
Director | 01 Jul 2003 - current |
Bruce Struan Robertson
Howick, Auckland,
Address used since 22 Oct 2003 |
Director | 19 May 2000 - 26 May 2005 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 12, 126 Vincent St, Auckland | Registered & physical | 07 Mar 2008 - 10 Nov 2011 |
C/-bdo Spicers, Level 2, 116 Harris Road, East Tamaki, Auckland | Registered & physical | 10 Jun 2004 - 07 Mar 2008 |
C/- Jollands Callander, Level 4, 3-13 Shortland Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 15 Oct 2002 - 10 Jun 2004 |
Level 5 Quay Tower, 29 Customs Street West, Auckland | Registered & physical | 19 May 2000 - 15 Oct 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brown, Inge Barbara Individual |
Mount Roskill Auckland 1041 |
27 Nov 2003 - current |
Brown, Shane Anthony Individual |
Mount Roskill Auckland 1041 |
27 Nov 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brown, Inge Barbara Individual |
Mount Roskill Auckland 1041 |
27 Nov 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brown, Shane Anthony Individual |
Mount Roskill Auckland 1041 |
27 Nov 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Robertson, Shirley Margaret Individual |
Mission Bay Auckland |
19 May 2000 - 24 Nov 2005 |
Robertson, Caroline Eugeni Individual |
Howick Auckland |
19 May 2000 - 24 Nov 2005 |
Robertson, Bruce Struan Individual |
Howick Auckland |
19 May 2000 - 24 Nov 2005 |
Robertson, Patricia Struan Individual |
Howick Auckland |
19 May 2000 - 24 Nov 2005 |
Birdwood Residential Estates Limited 642 Great South Road |
|
Outback Surf (2013) Limited 642 Great South Road |
|
Rugby Exchange New Zealand Limited 642 Great South Rd |
|
Aozora Trustees Limited 642 Great South Road |
|
Spare Room Solutions Limited 642 Great South Road |
|
Ggc Holdings Limited 642 Great South Road |