Clubwize Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429037255749) was started on 16 May 2000. 1 address is currently in use by the company: 4 Aydon Road, Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, 94 Queen Street, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 15 Mar 2021. 11300000 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 3000000 shares (26.55 per cent of shares), namely:
Gabriel Le Roux (an individual) located at Takapuna, Auckland postcode 0622. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 46.9 per cent of all shares (exactly 5300000 shares); it includes
Hendrick De Kock (an individual) - located at Hauraki, Auckland. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (1500000 shares, 13.27%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Bluesquare (Pty) Ltd, located at Centurion, Pretoria (an other). The Businesscheck database was updated on 23 Sep 2021.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
4 Aydon Road, Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 | Registered & physical | 15 Mar 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gabriel Jacobus Le Roux
Takapuna, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 30 Nov 2012 |
Director | 16 May 2000 - current |
Hendrick Lambert De Kock
Hauraki, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 01 Jan 2013 |
Director | 16 May 2000 - current |
Jean-paul Le Roux
Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 06 Oct 2020 |
Director | 06 Oct 2020 - current |
Denton Lawrence Spinley
Devonport, Auckland,
Address used since 30 May 2000 |
Director | 30 May 2000 - 27 Mar 2001 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 94 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 28 Sep 2018 - 15 Mar 2021 |
2-122 Aberdeen Road, Castor Bay, North Shore | Physical & registered | 04 Feb 2003 - 28 Sep 2018 |
1 Antares Place, Mairangi Bay, North Shore, Auckland | Physical | 13 Dec 2001 - 04 Feb 2003 |
41a Forest Hill Road, Milford, Auckland | Registered | 13 Dec 2001 - 04 Feb 2003 |
41a Forest Hill Road, Milford, Auckland | Physical | 13 Dec 2001 - 13 Dec 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gabriel Jacobus Le Roux Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
28 Nov 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hendrick Lambert De Kock Individual |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
28 Nov 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bluesquare (pty) Ltd Other |
Centurion Pretoria 0046 |
16 May 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Denton Lawrence Spinley Individual |
Devonport Auckland 0624 |
16 May 2000 - current |
Murray Lawrence Schnauer Individual |
Auckland 1010 |
16 May 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Loram Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037977412 Company Number: 880270 Entity |
16 May 2000 - 16 Dec 2004 | |
Hewitt Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038030987 Company Number: 869348 Entity |
16 May 2000 - 16 Dec 2004 | |
Loram Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037977412 Company Number: 880270 Entity |
16 May 2000 - 16 Dec 2004 | |
Hewitt Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038030987 Company Number: 869348 Entity |
16 May 2000 - 16 Dec 2004 |
Cpaccountants Limited 2-122 Aberdeen Road |
|
New Zealand Newkabe Health Limited 41 Aberdeen Road |
|
Blue Bay Interiors Limited 38 Aberdeen Road |
|
Harper Trading Co. Limited 48 Aberdeen Road |
|
E-resources Limited 30 Aberdeen Road |
|
Allforgrey Limited 30 Aberdeen Road |