Catchem Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037261504) was started on 09 May 2000. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: 2368 Whangarei Heads Road, Rd 4, Whangarei Heads, 0174 (type: postal, office). Russell Turner, Chartered Accountants, 58 Otaika Road, Whangarei 0110 had been their physical address, until 03 Oct 2013. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Gentry, Kerry (an individual) located at Rd 4, Whangarei Heads postcode 0174. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Gentry, Marlene (an individual) - located at Rd 4, Whangarei Heads. Businesscheck's information was updated on 06 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
23 Rathbone Street, Whangarei, 0110 | Physical & registered & service | 03 Oct 2013 |
2368 Whangarei Heads Road, Rd 4, Whangarei Heads, 0174 | Postal & office & delivery & invoice | 06 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Marlene Beverley Gentry
Rd 4, Whangarei Heads, 0174
Address used since 06 Sep 2019
R D 4, Whangarei, 0174
Address used since 28 Aug 2015 |
Director | 05 Jun 2007 - current |
Kerry Gentry
Rd 4, Taurikura,
Address used since 09 May 2000 |
Director | 09 May 2000 - 27 Aug 2007 |
Richard Thomas Salisbury
New Plymouth,
Address used since 09 May 2000 |
Director | 09 May 2000 - 09 May 2000 |
2368 Whangarei Heads Road , Rd 4 , Whangarei Heads , 0174 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Russell Turner, Chartered Accountants, 58 Otaika Road, Whangarei 0110 | Physical & registered | 21 May 2010 - 03 Oct 2013 |
Russell Turner, Chartered Accountants, 13 Rust Avenue, Whangarei 0110 | Registered & physical | 07 Nov 2008 - 21 May 2010 |
Mallett Angelo Quinn Ltd, 1st Floor, 5 Hunt Street, Whangarei | Registered & physical | 12 Sep 2007 - 07 Nov 2008 |
D B Quinn, Chartered Accountant, 5 Hunt Street, Whangarei | Registered & physical | 09 May 2000 - 12 Sep 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gentry, Kerry Individual |
Rd 4 Whangarei Heads 0174 |
09 May 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gentry, Marlene Individual |
Rd 4 Whangarei Heads 0174 |
09 May 2000 - current |
Bulk Earthworks Limited 23 Rathbone Street |
|
Holdaway & Preece Limited 23 Rathbone Street |
|
The Clean Auckland Limited 23 Rathbone Street |
|
Yhpj Trustees (2013) Limited 23 Rathbone Street |
|
Wolf Whistle Limited 23 Rathbone Street |
|
Beazley Dairy Farms Limited 23 Rathbone Street |