Safety Seatbelt Installation (Nz) Limited (issued a business number of 9429037317812) was registered on 21 Mar 2000. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 40 Amuri Street, Hei Hei, Christchurch, 8042 (type: physical, registered). 96/49 Covent Drive, Stoke, Nelson had been their physical address, until 26 Sep 2018. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 140 shares (14% of shares), namely:
Broome, Marcia Grace (an individual) located at Hei Hei, Christchurch postcode 8042. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 86% of all shares (exactly 860 shares); it includes
Broome, Russell David (an individual) - located at Hei Hei, Christchurch. "Vehicle testing station operation" (business classification O772020) is the category the ABS issued to Safety Seatbelt Installation (Nz) Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 31 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
40 Amuri Street, Hei Hei, Christchurch, 8042 | Physical & registered & service | 26 Sep 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Russell David Broome
Hei Hei, Christchurch, 8042
Address used since 21 Feb 2011 |
Director | 21 Mar 2000 - current |
Gary Charles Nightingale
Rolleston Park, Christchurch,
Address used since 21 Mar 2000 |
Director | 21 Mar 2000 - 21 Mar 2000 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
96/49 Covent Drive, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 | Physical & registered | 30 Nov 2017 - 26 Sep 2018 |
200 Hardy Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 | Physical & registered | 05 Jul 2017 - 30 Nov 2017 |
155a Trafalgar Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 | Registered & physical | 08 Mar 2017 - 05 Jul 2017 |
Unit 26, 115 Grove Street, The Wood, Nelson, 7010 | Registered & physical | 05 Jan 2012 - 08 Mar 2017 |
C/-graham Scoble, 6g, 66 Armagh Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical | 16 Sep 2011 - 05 Jan 2012 |
C/-graham Scoble, 6g, 66 Armagh Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered | 14 Apr 2011 - 05 Jan 2012 |
C/-graham Scoble, 59 Armagh Street, Christchurch 8013 | Physical | 26 Jan 2009 - 16 Sep 2011 |
C/-graham Scoble, 59 Armagh Street, Christchurch 8013 | Registered | 26 Jan 2009 - 14 Apr 2011 |
Apt B.0.4, Terrace On The Park, 78 Park Terrace, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 01 Jun 2004 - 26 Jan 2009 |
Apt C.1.2, Terrace On The Park, 78 Park Terrace, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 14 Nov 2003 - 01 Jun 2004 |
8 Roseneath Place, Cashmere, Christchurch 8002 | Physical & registered | 14 Jul 2003 - 14 Nov 2003 |
21 Spencer Street, Addington, Christchurch | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 14 Jul 2003 |
21 Spencer Street, Addington, Christchurch | Physical | 21 Mar 2000 - 14 Jul 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Broome, Marcia Grace Individual |
Hei Hei Christchurch 8042 |
21 Mar 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Broome, Russell David Individual |
Hei Hei Christchurch 8042 |
21 Mar 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Broome, Craig Lewis James Individual |
Kaiapoi |
21 Mar 2000 - 25 Sep 2007 |
Errv Special Needs Foundation Incorporated Townhouse 100 |
|
Scott Fang Property Limited 12 Best Place |
|
Measure Manage Resolve Limited 10 Ken Wadsworth Way |
|
Nelson Radio Control Stockcar Club Incorporated 1 Best Place |
|
Smart Array Limited 34 Cambelldon Crescent |
|
Bradwyn Holdings Limited 46 Cambelldon Crescent |
Richmond Vehicle Testing Station (2003) Limited 13 Mcglashen Avenue |
Picton Motordrome Limited 2 Alfred Street |
Vehicle Testing New Zealand Limited 5th Floor |
Dekra New Zealand Limited Level 5, 15 Willeston Street |
Vehicle Testing Kapiti Limited 196 Kapiti Road |
Automotive Design Limited 1st Floor |