R and A Farms Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429037318369) was launched on 30 Mar 2000. 7 addresess are currently in use by the company: 5 Lilburn Street, Warkworth, 0910 (type: registered, physical). 5 Lilburn Street, Warkworth had been their registered address, up to 27 Apr 2021. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Everitt, Raymond John (an individual) located at Rd 6, Warkworth. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Everitt, Aprile Dawn (an individual) - located at Rd 6, Warkworth. "Rental of commercial property" (business classification L671250) is the classification the ABS issued R and A Farms Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 30 Jun 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Office Of Kowhai Accounting Services Ltd, 24 Glenmore Drive, Warkworth, 0910 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 02 Oct 2012 |
5 Lilburn Street, Warkworth, 0910 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 18 Sep 2020 |
5 Lilburn Street, Warkworth, 0910 | Other (Address For Share Register) & records & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 16 Apr 2021 |
5 Lilburn Street, Warkworth, 0910 | Registered & physical & service | 27 Apr 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Aprile Dawn Rathe
Rd 6, Warkworth, 0986
Address used since 30 Mar 2000 |
Director | 30 Mar 2000 - current |
Raymond John Everitt
Rd 6, Warkworth, 0986
Address used since 30 Mar 2000 |
Director | 30 Mar 2000 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
5 Lilburn Street, Warkworth, 0910 | Registered & physical & service | 27 Apr 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
5 Lilburn Street, Warkworth, 0910 | Registered & physical | 28 Sep 2020 - 27 Apr 2021 |
24 Glenmore Drive, Warkworth, Warkworth, 0910 | Registered & physical | 10 Oct 2012 - 28 Sep 2020 |
Office Of Kowhai Accounting Services Ltd, 16 Glenmore Drive, Warkworth | Physical & registered | 17 Jun 2010 - 10 Oct 2012 |
Withers & Co, Chartered Accountants, 23 Neville Street, Warkworth | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 17 Jun 2010 |
Withers & Co, Chartered Accountants, 23 Neville Street, Warkworth | Physical | 30 Mar 2000 - 17 Jun 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Everitt, Raymond John Individual |
Rd 6 Warkworth |
30 Mar 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Everitt, Aprile Dawn Individual |
Rd 6 Warkworth 0986 |
30 Mar 2000 - current |
Kayll Enterprises Limited 20 Glenmore Drive |
|
Jb And Bw Super Limited 25 |
|
Maritime And Seafood Educators Association Of Aotearoa Incorporated 11 Glenmore Drive |
|
Rodney Marine Limited 51 Morrison Drive |
|
T.h Construction Limited 51 Morrison Drive |
|
Vallance Family Trustees Limited 51 Morrison Drive |
Kingpost Trustee Limited 54 Whitaker Road |
Srd Hub Limited 54 Whitaker Road |
Warkworth Investment Properties Limited 23 Neville Street |
Bridge Hotels Limited 16 Elizabeth Street |
Lyve Holdings Limited 1 Geen Road |
Raurenga Investments Limited 69d Wilson Rd |