Fraser Fire & Rescue Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429037337940) was registered on 09 Mar 2000. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 18 Peterkin Street, Taita, Taita, Lower Hutt, 5019 (type: registered, physical). 18 Peterkin Street, Taita, Lower Hutt had been their registered address, until 13 Oct 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Fraser, Raewyn Anne (an individual) located at Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt postcode 5013,
Simpson, Martin (an individual) located at Eastbourne, Lower Hutt postcode 5013. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
18 Peterkin Street, Taita, Lower Hutt, 5019 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 05 Oct 2020 |
18 Peterkin Street, Taita, Taita, Lower Hutt, 5019 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Oct 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Martin Simpson
Eastbourne, Lower Hutt, 5013
Address used since 01 Oct 2021
Taita, Lower Hutt, 5019
Address used since 15 Nov 2016
Lower Hutt, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 01 Oct 2015 |
Director | 09 Mar 2000 - current |
Raewyn Anne Fraser
Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013
Address used since 01 Mar 2022
Epuni, Lower Hutt, 5011
Address used since 07 May 2013
Woburn, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 01 Oct 2019 |
Director | 03 Aug 2007 - current |
John James Fraser
Paparangi, Wellington, 6037
Address used since 09 Mar 2000 |
Director | 09 Mar 2000 - 26 May 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
18 Peterkin Street, Taita, Lower Hutt, 5019 | Registered & physical | 26 Feb 2016 - 13 Oct 2020 |
1 Fry Street, Lower Hutt | Registered | 13 Apr 2000 - 26 Feb 2016 |
1 Fry Street, Lower Hutt | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 13 Apr 2000 |
1 Fry Street, Lower Hutt | Physical | 09 Mar 2000 - 26 Feb 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fraser, Raewyn Anne Individual |
Lowry Bay Lower Hutt 5013 |
09 Mar 2000 - current |
Simpson, Martin Individual |
Eastbourne Lower Hutt 5013 |
09 Mar 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fraser, John James Individual |
Paparangi Wellington |
09 Mar 2000 - 04 Oct 2022 |
Fraser Group Holdings Limited 18 Peterkin Street |
|
Jj Fraser Engineering Limited 18 Peterkin St |
|
Aviat Networks (nz) Limited 20 Peterkin Street |
|
C G Composites Limited 11 Peterkin Street |
|
Clives Car Parts Limited 22 Peterkin Street |
|
Lg & Af Limited 19 Peterkin Street |