3Sixty5 Hb Limited (NZBN 9429037374709) was incorporated on 22 Feb 2000. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 14 Elizabeth Road, Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 (type: registered, physical). Hanna Lessels, Chartered Accountants, 200 Queen Street West, Hastings had been their registered address, up to 29 Jun 2001. 3Sixty5 Hb Limited used other aliases, namely: Exit Limited from 23 Jan 2006 to 31 Jan 2012, Xplore.net Limited (19 Feb 2003 to 23 Jan 2006) and Adplus Online.com Limited (22 Feb 2000 - 19 Feb 2003). 120 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 60 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Hopkinson, Judith Leslie (an individual) located at Napier. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (60 shares); it includes
Hopkinson, Richard John (an individual) - located at Napier. Our database was last updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
14 Elizabeth Road, Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 | Service & physical | 09 Feb 2012 |
14 Elizabeth Road, Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 | Registered | 05 Mar 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Richard John Hopkinson
Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110
Address used since 18 May 2016 |
Director | 22 Feb 2000 - current |
Judith Leslie Hopkinson
Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110
Address used since 12 Aug 2011 |
Director | 12 Aug 2011 - current |
Blair Thomas Applegate
Greenmeadows, Napier, 4112
Address used since 12 Aug 2011 |
Director | 12 Aug 2011 - 01 Apr 2012 |
Andrew Ross Walker
Hastings,
Address used since 06 Sep 2004 |
Director | 22 Feb 2000 - 12 Aug 2011 |
Colin Ashton Campbell
R D 6, Napier,
Address used since 22 Feb 2000 |
Director | 22 Feb 2000 - 27 Mar 2002 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Hanna Lessels, Chartered Accountants, 200 Queen Street West, Hastings | Registered & physical | 29 Jun 2001 - 29 Jun 2001 |
Hanna Lessels, Chartered Accountants, 200 Queen Street West, Hastings | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 29 Jun 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hopkinson, Judith Leslie Individual |
Napier |
22 Feb 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hopkinson, Richard John Individual |
Napier |
22 Feb 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Walker, Andrew Ross Individual |
Hastings |
25 May 2004 - 22 Aug 2011 |
Applegate, Blair Thomas Individual |
Greenmeadows |
22 Feb 2000 - 01 May 2012 |
Applegate, Blair Thomas Individual |
Greenmeadows Napier 4112 |
11 Mar 2013 - 04 May 2022 |
Macgillivray, Lachlan Campbell Individual |
Maraetotara |
22 Feb 2000 - 22 Aug 2011 |
Walker, Margaret Kay Individual |
Hastings |
25 May 2004 - 22 Aug 2011 |
Smart Leisure Partnerships Limited 32 Lighthouse Road |
|
Steve Riley Contracting Limited 135 Priestley Terrace |
|
Bluffhill Lighthouse Limited 34 Lighthouse Road |
|
Ozone Technologies Limited 22 Lighthouse Road |
|
Nhc Limited 22 Lighthouse Road |
|
Tat Limited 131 Priestley Terrace |