Desert Heart Estate Limited (issued a business number of 9429037375423) was incorporated on 03 Feb 2000. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 182B Felton Road, Rd 2, Cromwell, 9384 (type: postal, office). Felton Road, Bannockburn, Rd2 Cromwell had been their registered address, up until 13 May 2019. 45000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 22500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Gill, Jane Elizabeth (an individual) located at Bannockburn, Otago postcode 9384. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (22500 shares); it includes
Downie, Denny (an individual) - located at Bannockburn, Otago. "Vineyard operation" (ANZSIC A013120) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Desert Heart Estate Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 14 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
182b Felton Road, Bannockburn, Rd2 Cromwell, 9384 | Physical & registered & service | 13 May 2019 |
182b Felton Road, Rd 2, Cromwell, 9384 | Postal & office & delivery | 05 May 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Gill
R D 2 Cromwell, Otago, 9384
Address used since 08 May 2017
R D 2 Cromwell, Otago, 9384
Address used since 02 May 2016 |
Director | 03 Feb 2000 - current |
Denny Downie
R D 2 Cromwell, Otago, 9384
Address used since 03 May 2016 |
Director | 03 Feb 2000 - current |
Paula Renouf
Herne Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 03 Feb 2000 |
Director | 03 Feb 2000 - 22 Sep 2003 |
182b Felton Road , Rd 2 , Cromwell , 9384 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Felton Road, Bannockburn, Rd2 Cromwell | Registered | 11 May 2004 - 13 May 2019 |
2/47 Rautara Street, Orakei, Auckland | Registered | 21 May 2001 - 11 May 2004 |
2/47 Rautara Street, Orakei, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 21 May 2001 |
Felton Road, Bannock Burn, Central Otago | Physical | 03 Feb 2000 - 13 May 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gill, Jane Elizabeth Individual |
Bannockburn Otago 9384 |
03 Feb 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Downie, Denny Individual |
Bannockburn Otago 9384 |
03 Feb 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Callisto Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039939869 Company Number: 243563 Entity |
04 May 2004 - 04 May 2004 | |
Callisto Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039939869 Company Number: 243563 Entity |
04 May 2004 - 04 May 2004 |
Gilbro Group Limited 182b Felton Road |
|
Gate 20 Two Limited 143 Felton Road |
|
Picardy Holdings Limited 106 Felton Road |
|
Crosby Developments Limited 106 Felton Road |
|
Ican Queenstown Limited 106 Felton Road |
Steve Mcdowell Limited 219 Cairnmuir Road. |
Grape Vision Limited 128 Cairnmuir Road |
Queensberry Gardens Limited 29 The Mall |
Mcdowell Mcdowell Limited 1 Shortcut Road |
Vinewise Machinery Limited 6 Lowburn Terrace |
Peren Farms Limited 321 Gibbston Back Road |