Westgate Projects Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429037377380) was incorporated on 07 Feb 2000. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 18B / 9 Chews Lane, Wellington, 6011 (type: physical, registered). 150 Featherston Street, Wellington had been their registered address, until 05 Dec 2018. Westgate Projects Limited used other aliases, namely: Westlake Health Care Limited from 07 Feb 2000 to 17 Jul 2007. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
New Zealand Forest Brokers Limited (an entity) located at Wellington postcode 6011. Our information was last updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
18b / 9 Chews Lane, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered & service | 05 Dec 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Bruce Marriott
Wellington, 6011
Address used since 01 Nov 2015 |
Director | 07 Feb 2000 - current |
Peter William Mckenzie Angus
Lower Hutt, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 11 Jun 2010 |
Director | 17 Jul 2007 - 01 Nov 2011 |
William Victor Middleditch
Oriental Bay, Wellington,
Address used since 07 Feb 2000 |
Director | 07 Feb 2000 - 17 Jul 2007 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
150 Featherston Street, Wellington | Registered & physical | 16 May 2008 - 05 Dec 2018 |
4/2 Oriental Terrace, Oriental Bay, Wellington | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 16 May 2008 |
4/2 Oriental Terrace, Oriental Bay, Wellington | Physical | 08 Feb 2000 - 16 May 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
New Zealand Forest Brokers Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038853838 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Wellington 6011 |
07 Feb 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kensway Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038798764 Company Number: 602751 Entity |
10 May 2008 - 01 Nov 2011 | |
Mount Patriarch Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040945644 Company Number: 9528 Entity |
07 Feb 2000 - 10 May 2008 | |
Kensway Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038798764 Company Number: 602751 Entity |
10 May 2008 - 01 Nov 2011 | |
Mount Patriarch Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040945644 Company Number: 9528 Entity |
07 Feb 2000 - 10 May 2008 |
Goldfeder Mccormick Limited Level 1, Change House |
|
Petroquest Energy Limited 1st Floor, 150 Featherston Street |
|
International Immobiliare Limited 1st Floor, 150 Featherston Street |
|
Swisscorp Securities Trust Limited 1st Floor, 150 Featherston Street |
|
Petrocorp Energy Limited 1st Floor, 150 Featherston Street |
|
Order Of Ahepa Incorporated C/o Mcculloch & Sygrove |