Harakeke Farms Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037379100) was registered on 28 Jan 2000. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 53-61 Whitaker Street, Te Aroha, 3320 (type: physical, registered). 53-61 Whitaker Street, Te Aroha had been their registered address, up to 27 Feb 2020. 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 98 shares (98 per cent of shares), namely:
Diprose Miller Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Te Aroha postcode 3320,
Teague, Judy Mary (an individual) located at Rd 1, Rotorua postcode 3077,
Teague, Peter Francis (an individual) located at Rd 1, Rotorua postcode 3077. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Teague, Peter Francis (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Rotorua. The next group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Teague, Judy Mary, located at Rd 1, Rotorua (an individual). Businesscheck's information was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
53-61 Whitaker Street, Te Aroha, 3320 | Physical & registered & service | 27 Feb 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Francis Teague
Rd 1, Rotorua, 3077
Address used since 01 Apr 2013 |
Director | 28 Jan 2000 - current |
Judy Mary Teague
Rd 1, Rotorua, 3077
Address used since 01 Apr 2013 |
Director | 28 Jan 2000 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
53-61 Whitaker Street, Te Aroha, 3320 | Registered & physical | 07 May 2005 - 27 Feb 2020 |
Diprose Miller Limited, Chartered Accountants, 53-61 Whitaker Street, Te Aroha | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 07 May 2005 |
Diprose Miller Limited, Chartered Accountants, 53-61 Whitaker Street, Te Aroha | Physical | 28 Jan 2000 - 07 May 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Diprose Miller Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038080005 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Te Aroha 3320 |
28 Jan 2000 - current |
Teague, Judy Mary Individual |
Rd 1 Rotorua 3077 |
28 Jan 2000 - current |
Teague, Peter Francis Individual |
Rd 1 Rotorua 3077 |
28 Jan 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Teague, Peter Francis Individual |
Rd 1 Rotorua 3077 |
28 Jan 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Teague, Judy Mary Individual |
Rd 1 Rotorua 3077 |
28 Jan 2000 - current |
Magjc Investments 2013 Limited 53-61 Whitaker Street |
|
Meereveld Farms Limited 53-61 Whitaker Street |
|
Mowbray Dairies Limited 53-61 Whitaker Street |
|
Diprose Miller Trustees 2013 Limited 53-61 Whitaker Street |
|
Ritchton Limited 53-61 Whitaker Street |
|
Fj&am Holdings Limited 53-61 Whitaker Street |