Raewyn O'connor Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429037389918) was incorporated on 10 Feb 2000. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 149 Longlands Road, Rd 2, Hastings, 4172 (type: office, registered). 43 Carlyle Street, Napier South, Napier had been their registered address, up until 07 Jul 2022. 1000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 998 shares (99.8 per cent of shares), namely:
Lapsley, Gianetta Margaret Ann (an individual) located at Rd 3, Glen Oroua postcode 4473. "Clinic - dental" (business classification Q853110) is the category the ABS issued Raewyn O'connor Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
149 Longlands Road, Rd 2, Hastings, 4172 | Office | unknown |
5 Carlyle Street, Napier South, Napier, 4110 | Registered & physical & service | 07 Jul 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Raewyn Louise O'connor
Poraiti, Napier, 4112
Address used since 22 Oct 2018
Rd 9, Hastings, 4179
Address used since 18 Jun 2018
Rd 2, Hastings, 4172
Address used since 12 May 2010
Rd 11, Hastings, 4178
Address used since 12 Jun 2017 |
Director | 10 Feb 2000 - current |
149 Longlands Road , Rd 2 , Hastings , 4172 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
43 Carlyle Street, Napier South, Napier, 4110 | Registered & physical | 22 Dec 2016 - 07 Jul 2022 |
149 Longlands Road East, Rd 2, Hastings, 4172 | Physical & registered | 13 Jun 2012 - 22 Dec 2016 |
149 Longlands Road East, Rd2 Hastings | Registered & physical | 07 Jul 2005 - 13 Jun 2012 |
45 Havelock Road, Havelock North | Registered & physical | 18 Oct 2004 - 07 Jul 2005 |
Jones Road, Hunua, Rd3 Papakura | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 18 Oct 2004 |
Jones Road, Hunua, Rd3 Papakura | Physical | 10 Feb 2000 - 18 Oct 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lapsley, Gianetta Margaret Ann Individual |
Rd 3 Glen Oroua 4473 |
01 Jun 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'connor, Raewyn Louise Individual |
Rd2 Hastings |
10 Feb 2000 - 14 Dec 2016 |
Goggin, Todd Michael Individual |
Rd2 Hastings |
10 Feb 2000 - 21 Aug 2011 |
O'connor, Raewyn Louise Individual |
Rd2 Hastings |
10 Feb 2000 - 14 Dec 2016 |
O'connor, Raewyn Louise Individual |
Poraiti Napier 4112 |
10 Feb 2000 - 14 Dec 2016 |
O'connor, Raewyn Louise Individual |
Rd2 Hastings |
10 Feb 2000 - 14 Dec 2016 |
Goggin, Todd Michael Individual |
Rd2 Hastings |
10 Feb 2000 - 21 Aug 2011 |
The Huddy Beakle Company Limited 43 Carlyle St |
|
Animal Innovations Limited 43 Carlyle Street |
|
Helidrill Services Limited 43 Carlyle Street |
|
Zoido Limited 43 Carlyle Street |
|
Approved Car Finance Limited 43 Carlyle Street |
|
Place Real Estate Limited 43 Carlyle Street |
Pothula Holdings Limited 106a Kennedy Road |
Mahi Dental Limited 106 A Kennedy Road |
Golden Apple Dental Limited 190 Auckland Road |
John Egan Total Dentures Limited 10 Porter Drive |
Ocean Dental Limited 202 Grey Street |
Denture Clinic Gisborne Limited 96 Derby Street |