K.j. Systems Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429037439002) was launched on 08 Nov 1999. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 132372, Sylvia Park, Auckland, 1644 (type: postal, office). A14, 1066 Great South Rd, Mt Wellington, Auckland had been their physical address, until 13 Mar 2015. 1 share is issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Wu, Kun (a director) located at Bucklands Beach, Auckland postcode 2012. "Alarm system installation" (ANZSIC E323410) is the category the ABS issued K.j. Systems Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 31 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
A4, 1066 Great South Rd, Mt Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Mar 2015 |
Po Box 132372, Sylvia Park, Auckland, 1644 | Postal | 26 Feb 2020 |
A4, 1066 Great South Rd, Mt Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Office & delivery | 26 Feb 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kun Wu
East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 11 Mar 2020 |
Director | 06 Mar 2020 - current |
Ping Zhou
Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 04 Mar 2016 |
Director | 26 Jul 2002 - 06 Mar 2020 |
Kun Wu
Mt Eden, Auckland,
Address used since 08 Nov 1999 |
Director | 08 Nov 1999 - 26 Jul 2002 |
A4, 1066 Great South Rd , Mt Wellington , Auckland , 1060 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
A14, 1066 Great South Rd, Mt Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Physical & registered | 14 Mar 2014 - 13 Mar 2015 |
B14, 1066 Great South Rd, Mt Wellington, Auckland | Registered & physical | 20 Jan 2010 - 14 Mar 2014 |
530 Ellerslie-panmure Hwy, Panmure, Auckland | Physical & registered | 21 Nov 2006 - 20 Jan 2010 |
1st Floor, 536 Ellerslie Panmure Highway, Panmure, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 21 Nov 2006 |
1st Floor, 536 Ellerslie Panmure Highway, Panmure, Auckland | Physical | 09 Nov 1999 - 21 Nov 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wu, Kun Director |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 |
06 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Zhou, Ping Individual |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 |
15 Apr 2004 - 06 Mar 2020 |
Bpf Solutions Limited Unit B10, 1066 Great South Road |
|
Ming Fans Motor Limited Units B9,1066 Great South Road |
|
Ppg Industries New Zealand Limited 5 Vestey Drive |
|
Inshore Fisheries Jv Limited Partnership Aotearoa Fisheries Limited |
|
Joint Venture General Partner Limited 1-3 Bell Ave |
|
Ocean Ranch (2008) Limited 1-3 Bell Avenue |
Dankosec (nz) Limited 120 Carbine Road |
Chubb New Zealand 3 Fisher Cresent |
Cinco Limited 132 Trafalgar Street |
Prime Tech Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
Strategic Security Group Limited 18 Greenmount Drive |
Peach And Co Limited 18 Greenmount Drive |