Via Sollertia Jewellery Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037486150) was incorporated on 09 Sep 1999. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 36 Birmingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 (type: physical, service). The Office Of Phillip J Blacktopp, Unit 2, St James Court, 77 Gloucester Street, Christchurch had been their physical address, up to 01 Mar 2016. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Williams, Joel (an individual) located at Dallington, Christchurch postcode 8061. Businesscheck's information was updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
36 Birmingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 22 Feb 2016 |
36 Birmingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 | Physical & service & registered | 01 Mar 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Joel Williams
Dallington, Christchurch, 8061
Address used since 01 Nov 2022 |
Director | 01 Nov 2022 - current |
Rachel May Williams
Richmond, Christchurch, 8013
Address used since 01 Jun 2016 |
Director | 01 Jun 2016 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Ian Grant Williams
Richmond, Christchurch, 8013
Address used since 01 Feb 2016 |
Director | 09 Sep 1999 - 01 Jan 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
The Office Of Phillip J Blacktopp, Unit 2, St James Court, 77 Gloucester Street, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 12 Mar 2005 - 01 Mar 2016 |
The Office Of Phillip J Blacktopp, Unit 12, St James Court, 77 Gloucester Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 08 Apr 2003 - 12 Mar 2005 |
149a Victoria Street, Christchurch | Physical | 07 Apr 2002 - 08 Apr 2003 |
149a Victoria Stree, Christchurch | Registered | 07 Apr 2002 - 08 Apr 2003 |
464b Papanui Road, Christchurch | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 07 Apr 2002 |
464b Papanui Road, Christchurch | Physical | 09 Sep 1999 - 07 Apr 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Williams, Joel Individual |
Dallington Christchurch 8061 |
01 Nov 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Williams, Rachel May Individual |
Christchurch |
09 Sep 1999 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Williams, Ian Grant Individual |
Christchurch |
09 Sep 1999 - 21 Feb 2017 |
Vulcan Place Investments Limited 36 Birmingham Drive |
|
Yorke Limited 36 Birmingham Drive |
|
Gb & Dw Transport Limited 36 Birmingham Drive |
|
Xoria Limited 36 Birmingham Drive |
|
Testing And Tagging Limited 36 Birmingham Drive |
|
Mint Fitness Birmingham Drive Limited 36 Birmingham Drive |