Volcano Lighting Limited (NZBN 9429037562755) was started on 11 Jun 1999. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 588 Chapel Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (type: registered, physical). 109A Ti Rakau Drive, Pakuranga, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 23 Feb 2016. 1500 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 1498 shares (99.87% of shares), namely:
Mckinnon, Grant Richard (an individual) located at Oratia, Auckland 0604,
Mckinnon, Yvette Lindsay (an individual) located at Rd 1, Waimauku postcode 0891. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.07% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Mckinnon, Grant Richard (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Waimauku. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 0.07%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Mckinnon, Yvette Lindsay, located at Oratia, Auckland 0604 (an individual). The Businesscheck database was updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
588 Chapel Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & physical & service | 23 Feb 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Grant Richard Mckinnon
Oratia, Waitakere, 0604
Address used since 11 Feb 2010
Rd 1, Waimauku, 0891
Address used since 11 Apr 2018 |
Director | 11 Jun 1999 - current |
Grant Richmond Mckinnon
Rd 1, Waimauku, 0891
Address used since 11 Apr 2018 |
Director | 11 Jun 1999 - current |
Mark Lomani Archibald
Western Springs, Auckland,
Address used since 14 Feb 2005 |
Director | 11 Jun 1999 - 08 Apr 2005 |
Richard Llewellyn Evans
Grey Lynn, Auckland,
Address used since 14 Feb 2005 |
Director | 11 Jun 1999 - 08 Apr 2005 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
109a Ti Rakau Drive, Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 | Registered & physical | 19 Feb 2013 - 23 Feb 2016 |
107a Ti Rakau Drive, Pakuranga, Manukau 2010 | Registered | 18 Feb 2010 - 19 Feb 2013 |
C/-mathieson & Co, 107a Ti Rakau Drive, Pakuranga, Manukau 2010 | Physical | 18 Feb 2010 - 19 Feb 2013 |
C/- Mathieson & Co, 107a Ti Rakau Drive, Pakuranga, Auckland | Physical & registered | 01 Mar 2004 - 18 Feb 2010 |
43a Linwood Ave, Mt Albert, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 01 Mar 2004 |
43a Linwood Ave, Mt Albert, Auckland | Physical | 15 Jun 1999 - 01 Mar 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mckinnon, Grant Richard Individual |
Oratia Auckland 0604 |
19 Feb 2004 - current |
Mckinnon, Yvette Lindsay Individual |
Rd 1 Waimauku 0891 |
20 Apr 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mckinnon, Grant Richard Individual |
Rd 1 Waimauku 0891 |
19 Feb 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mckinnon, Yvette Lindsay Individual |
Oratia Auckland 0604 |
20 Apr 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Archibald, Mark Lomani Individual |
Western Springs Auckland |
11 Jun 1999 - 15 Feb 2005 |
Evans, Richard Llewellyn Individual |
Grey Lynn Auckland |
11 Jun 1999 - 15 Feb 2005 |
Fire Safety Equipment Limited 588 Chapel Road |
|
Best Property Care Limited The Lane, Level 1, Botany Centre |
|
F Darracott-cankovic Limited Level 1, The Lane, Botany Town Centre |
|
Enable Work Solutions Limited Level 1, The Lane, Botany Centre |
|
Prov3.5-6 Limited Level 1, The Lane, Botany Centre |
|
B P Roofing Limited Level 1, Botany Centre |