Eigen Systems Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429037569983) was registered on 25 Jun 1999. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 30 Triton Drive, Albany, Auckland (type: physical, registered). 100 Central Park Drive, Henderson, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 12 Apr 2005. 150 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 135 shares (90% of shares), namely:
Tollcross Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Henderson, Waitakere postcode 0610,
Forlong, Murray Houlton (an individual) located at Rosedale, Auckland postcode 0632. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 10% of all shares (exactly 15 shares); it includes
Were, Christopher (an individual) - located at Remuera, Auckland,
Lockhart Trustee Services Limited (an entity) - located at Epsom, Auckland. Businesscheck's data was updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
30 Triton Drive, Albany, Auckland | Physical & service | 12 Apr 2005 |
30 Triton Drive, Albany | Registered | 12 Apr 2005 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Murray Houlton Forlong
Rosedale, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 15 Feb 2024
Red Beach, Red Beach, 0932
Address used since 01 Mar 2022
Orewa, Orewa, 0931
Address used since 19 Mar 2020
Rd 4, Albany, 0794
Address used since 03 May 2010 |
Director | 25 Jun 1999 - current |
Bruce Howard Forlong
Albany, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Apr 2005 |
Director | 25 Jun 1999 - 30 Nov 2012 |
Christopher James Were
Kingsland, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 25 Jun 1999 |
Director | 25 Jun 1999 - 01 Apr 2009 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
100 Central Park Drive, Henderson, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 12 Apr 2005 |
100 Central Park Drive, Henderson, Auckland | Physical | 28 Jun 1999 - 12 Apr 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tollcross Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047731431 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Henderson Waitakere 0610 |
13 Dec 2019 - current |
Forlong, Murray Houlton Individual |
Rosedale Auckland 0632 |
27 May 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Were, Christopher Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
24 Mar 2015 - current |
Lockhart Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031674546 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
24 Mar 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Forlong, Jennifer Margaret Individual |
Rd 4 Albany 0794 |
11 Dec 2012 - 13 Mar 2024 |
Forlong, Jennifer Margaret Individual |
Rd 4 Albany 0794 |
11 Dec 2012 - 13 Mar 2024 |
Forlong, Jennifer Margaret Individual |
Rd 4 Albany 0794 |
11 Dec 2012 - 13 Mar 2024 |
Forlong, Jennifer Margaret Individual |
Rd 4 Albany 0794 |
11 Dec 2012 - 13 Mar 2024 |
Were, Christopher James Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
25 Jun 1999 - 24 Mar 2015 |
Forlong, Bruce Howard Individual |
Redvale Auckland 0630 |
25 Jun 1999 - 11 Dec 2012 |
Bm Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037699291 Company Number: 938649 Entity |
Henderson Auckland Null |
11 Dec 2012 - 13 Dec 2019 |
Bm Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037699291 Company Number: 938649 Entity |
Henderson Auckland Null |
11 Dec 2012 - 13 Dec 2019 |
Weta Estate Limited 30 Triton Drive |
|
Whakapai Limited 30 Triton Drive |
|
Kinetic Engineering Design Limited 30 Triton Drive |
|
Kinetic Cutting Systems Limited 30 Triton Drive |
|
Tots Limited 23 Triton Drive |