Indoor Dining Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037895303) was launched on 27 Mar 1998. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 12A Jack Conway Avenue, Manukau, Auckland, 2104 (type: physical, service). Level 1, 14 Penrose Road, Penrose, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 29 Aug 2014. 1000 shares are allotted to 0 shareholders who belong to 0 shareholder groups. The Businesscheck database was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
12a Jack Conway Avenue, Manukau, Auckland, 2104 | Physical & service & registered | 29 Aug 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Martin Forbes Harrap
Rd 4, Whangarei, 0174
Address used since 23 Aug 2016 |
Director | 27 Mar 1998 - current |
Georgina Marietta Harrap
Rd 4, Whangarei, 0174
Address used since 23 Aug 2016 |
Director | 27 Mar 1998 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 14 Penrose Road, Penrose, Auckland | Registered & physical | 28 Nov 2005 - 29 Aug 2014 |
248 Mt Wellington Highway, Mt Wellington, Auckland | Physical & registered | 02 Sep 2003 - 28 Nov 2005 |
C & A Chartered Accountants, 108 Swanson Road, Henderson, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 02 Sep 2003 |
C & A Chartered Accountants, 108 Swanson Road, Henderson, Auckland | Physical | 27 Mar 1998 - 02 Sep 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harrap, Georgina Marietta Individual |
Murrays Bay Auckland |
27 Mar 1998 - 08 Apr 2015 |
Harrap, Martin Forbes Individual |
Murrays Bay Auckland |
27 Mar 1998 - 08 Apr 2015 |
Harrap, Georgina Marietta Individual |
Rd 4 Whangarei 0174 |
27 Mar 1998 - 08 Apr 2015 |
Harrap, Martin Forbes Individual |
Rd 4 Whangarei 0174 |
27 Mar 1998 - 08 Apr 2015 |
Harrap, Georgina Marietta Individual |
Murrays Bay Auckland |
27 Mar 1998 - 08 Apr 2015 |
Harrap, Martin Forbes Individual |
Murrays Bay Auckland |
27 Mar 1998 - 08 Apr 2015 |
Cpr Property Maintenance Limited 12a Jack Conway Avenue |
|
Tranquility Service Limited 12a Jack Conway Avenue |
|
Kiwi Oil Limited 12a Jack Conway Avenue |
|
Sportfolio (uk) Limited 12a Jack Conway Avenue |
|
Ronald Young Trustee Limited 12a Jack Conway Avenue |
|
Holistic Holdings NZ Limited 12a Jack Conway Avenue |