Waller Projects Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038354960) was incorporated on 10 Apr 1996. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1 Westgate Chambers, 3A/2 Maki Street, Westgate, Auckland, 0614 (type: physical, registered). Level 1 Westgate Chambers, Main Street, Westgate, Massey, Auckland 0614 had been their physical address, up until 21 Oct 2016. Waller Projects Limited used more names, namely: Waller Consulting Limited from 10 Mar 2008 to 08 Dec 2009, Meridian Group Limited (10 Apr 1996 to 10 Mar 2008). 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 99 shares (99 per cent of shares), namely:
Waller, Mark Darron (an individual) located at Whenuapai, Waitakere postcode 0618. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Waller, Ruth (an individual) - located at Whenuapai, Waitakere. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1 Westgate Chambers, 3a/2 Maki Street, Westgate, Auckland, 0614 | Physical & registered & service | 21 Oct 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Darron Waller
Whenuapai, Waitakere, 0618
Address used since 19 Apr 2011 |
Director | 10 Apr 1996 - current |
Craig Walter Blaikie
Mt Eden, Auckland,
Address used since 10 Apr 1996 |
Director | 10 Apr 1996 - 18 Nov 1998 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1 Westgate Chambers, Main Street, Westgate, Massey, Auckland 0614 | Physical & registered | 10 Mar 2008 - 21 Oct 2016 |
Seal & Co, Chartered Accountants, 137 Vincent Street, Auckland | Registered | 01 Nov 2001 - 10 Mar 2008 |
Level 3, 117 St Georges Bay Rd, Parnell, Auckland | Physical | 01 Nov 2001 - 10 Mar 2008 |
Seal & Co, Chartered Accountants, 137 Vincent Street, Auckland | Physical | 01 Nov 2001 - 01 Nov 2001 |
Seal & Co, Chartered Accountants, 137 Vincent Street, Auckland | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 01 Nov 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Waller, Mark Darron Individual |
Whenuapai Waitakere 0618 |
15 Dec 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Waller, Ruth Individual |
Whenuapai Waitakere 0618 |
23 Sep 2008 - current |
Rest Easy Bed Company Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Parkhead Holdings Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Rad Investments Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Selkprop Investments Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Our Real Estate Company Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Ridleydunphy Environmental Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |