Union Grating Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038460906) was incorporated on 16 Jun 1995. 7 addresess are currently in use by the company: Level 2 Tavendale Centre, 329 Durham Street North,, Christchurch, 8044 (type: registered, physical). 85A Huntsbury Avenue, Huntsbury, Christchurch had been their physical address, until 22 Mar 2022. Union Grating Limited used other names, namely: Gibraltar Shelf No.57 Limited from 16 Jun 1995 to 17 Dec 1996. 200 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 198 shares (99 per cent of shares), namely:
Mark Alan O'brien, Margaret Joan O'brien and Canterbury Trustees (2004) Limited As Trustees Of The M A & M J O'brien Family T (an other) located at Huntsbury, Christchurch postcode 8022. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.5 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Obrien, Margaret Joan (an individual) - located at Christchurch. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 0.5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Obrien, Mark Alan, located at Christchurch (an individual). "Steel wholesaling" (business classification F332275) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Union Grating Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2 Tavendale Centre, 329 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8440 | Records & other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister | 16 Mar 2017 |
85a Huntsbury Avenue, Huntsbury, Christchurch, 8022 | Postal & delivery | 05 Mar 2020 |
Level 2 Tavendale Centre, 329 Durham Street North,, Christchurch, 8044 | Registered & physical & service | 22 Mar 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Alan Obrien
Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 23 Jan 1997 |
Director | 23 Jan 1997 - current |
Margaret Joan Obrien
Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 23 Jan 1997 |
Director | 23 Jan 1997 - current |
Ian Everard Hopkinson
Christchurch,
Address used since 10 Dec 1996 |
Director | 10 Dec 1996 - 23 Jan 1997 |
Philip John Baird
Christchurch,
Address used since 16 Jun 1995 |
Director | 16 Jun 1995 - 10 Dec 1996 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
85a Huntsbury Avenue, Huntsbury, Christchurch, 8022 | Physical & registered | 03 Jul 2006 - 22 Mar 2022 |
C/-ernst & Young, 6th Floor, Ernst 7 Young House, 227 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch | Registered | 15 Apr 1997 - 03 Jul 2006 |
C/-harman & Co, Level 19, Price Waterhouse Centre, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Registered | 24 Dec 1996 - 15 Apr 1997 |
C/-ernst & Young, 6th Floor, Ernst & Young House, 227 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch | Physical | 24 Dec 1996 - 03 Jul 2006 |
C/-harman & Co, Level 19, Price Waterhouse Centre, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Physical | 24 Dec 1996 - 24 Dec 1996 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Alan O'brien, Margaret Joan O'brien And Canterbury Trustees (2004) Limited As Trustees Of The M A & M J O'brien Family T Other (Other) |
Huntsbury Christchurch 8022 |
30 Mar 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Obrien, Margaret Joan Individual |
Christchurch |
30 Mar 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Obrien, Mark Alan Individual |
Christchurch |
30 Mar 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'brien, Margaret Joan Individual |
Christchurch |
16 Jun 1995 - 30 Mar 2005 |
O'brien, Mark Alan Individual |
Christchurch |
16 Jun 1995 - 30 Mar 2005 |
New Zealand Arts Education Trust 83 Huntsbury Avenue |
|
3buoys Holdings Limited 71 Aotea Terrace |
|
Pursuit Action Clothing Limited 99 Huntsbury Av, |
|
Eftpos International Limited 92 Huntsbury Avenue |
|
Media Source Solutions (nz) Limited 96 Huntsbury Ave |
Marsden International (nz) Limited 62 Pillans Road |
Nazwaz Distributors Limited 4 Tennesse Ave |
Quality Heat Treatment Limited 408 Oaia Road |
Viking Steels Limited 25 Beach Rd |
Special Steels And Metals Limited 25 Beach Road |
All Steel Services (2005) Limited 150 Captain Springs Road |