Crispstart Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429038488528) was started on 12 Apr 1995. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 130 Waikawa Road, Picton, Marlborough (type: physical, service). Crisp Limited, 130 Waikawa Road, Picton had been their physical address, up until 16 Apr 2007. Crispstart Limited used other names, namely: Crisp Limited from 26 Apr 2002 to 19 Sep 2005, Nick Gerritsen Limited (12 Apr 1995 to 26 Apr 2002). 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 95 shares (95 per cent of shares), namely:
Montreal Trustees 2017 Limited (an entity) located at Christchurch postcode 8011. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 28 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Old St Thomas's, 130 Waikawa Road, Picton | Registered | 08 Aug 1996 |
130 Waikawa Road, Picton, Marlborough | Physical & service | 16 Apr 2007 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nicholas Harold Gerritsen
Picton, Picton, 7220
Address used since 25 Mar 2010 |
Director | 12 Apr 1995 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Crisp Limited, 130 Waikawa Road, Picton | Physical | 07 May 2004 - 16 Apr 2007 |
'windhoek', Waitaria Bay, Kenepuru Sound, R D 2 Picton | Registered | 08 Aug 1996 - 08 Aug 1996 |
Nick Gerristen Limited, Po Box 558, Picton 7372, Aaaah8aakaaawo5aat | Physical | 12 Apr 1995 - 07 May 2004 |
0windhoek', Waitaria Bay, Kenepuru Sound, R D 2 Picton | Registered | 12 Apr 1995 - 08 Aug 1996 |
Old St. Thomas's, 130 Waikawa Road, Picton | Physical | 12 Apr 1995 - 12 Apr 1995 |
'windhoek', Waitatia Bay, Keneperu Sound, R D 2 Picton | Physical | 12 Apr 1995 - 12 Apr 1995 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Montreal Trustees 2017 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429045966200 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Christchurch 8011 |
28 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gerritsen, Nicholas Harold Individual |
130 Waikawa Road Picton |
30 Apr 2004 - 30 Apr 2004 |
Buchan, John Alexander Individual |
Picton |
30 Apr 2004 - 28 Aug 2017 |
Gerritsen, Nicholas Harold Individual |
Picton |
30 Apr 2004 - 30 Apr 2004 |
Gerritsen, Nicholas Harold Individual |
130 Waikawa Road Picton |
30 Apr 2004 - 30 Apr 2004 |
Gerritsen, Nicholas Harold Individual |
130 Waikawa Road Picton |
30 Apr 2004 - 30 Apr 2004 |
Celsias Limited 130 Waikawa Road |
|
Finial Trustee Limited 123 Waikawa Road |
|
Avalon Jewellers And Fine Gifts Limited 67 Milton Terrace |
|
Sj Hall Business Consultancy Limited 58 Hampden Street |
|
Sustainance Limited 58 Hampden Street |
|
Picton Mobility Shuttles Limited 114 Waikawa Road |