Dignity With Sincerity Funeral Services Limited (issued a business number of 9429038490132) was incorporated on 12 Apr 1995. 1 address is in use by the company: 16A Glendevere Terrace, Redcliffs, Christchurch, 8081 (type: registered, physical). 46 Acheron Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch had been their physical address, until 26 Oct 2021. Dignity With Sincerity Funeral Services Limited used other names, namely: Dignity With Simplicity Funeral Services Limited from 12 Apr 1995 to 19 Apr 1996. 1000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.1% of shares), namely:
Cheryl Cowden (an individual) located at Redcliffs, Christchurch postcode 8081. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Caroleen Crack (an individual) - located at Redcliffs, Christchurch. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (998 shares, 99.8%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Trustees Of Cowden Trust, located at Redcliffs, Christchurch (an other). "Funeral directing" (business classification S952030) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Dignity With Sincerity Funeral Services Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 03 Jul 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
16a Glendevere Terrace, Redcliffs, Christchurch, 8081 | Registered & physical | 26 Oct 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Cheryl Ann Cowden
Redcliffs, Christchurch, 8081
Address used since 01 Apr 2016 |
Director | 12 Apr 1995 - current |
78 Brisbane Street , Sydenham , Christchurch , 8023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
46 Acheron Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 | Physical & registered | 04 Dec 2018 - 26 Oct 2021 |
46 Acheron Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 | Registered & physical | 27 Apr 2015 - 04 Dec 2018 |
Martz Limited, 26 Birmingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurh 8024 | Registered | 09 Feb 2010 - 27 Apr 2015 |
Martz Limited, 26 Bimingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurch 8024 | Physical | 09 Feb 2010 - 27 Apr 2015 |
135 Ensors Road, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 13 Oct 2009 - 09 Feb 2010 |
Hfk Limited, Unit 4, 567 Wairakei Road, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 09 Sep 2008 - 13 Oct 2009 |
Crichton Horne & Associates, 109 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch | Physical | 14 May 2008 - 09 Sep 2008 |
109 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch | Physical | 04 Apr 2002 - 14 May 2008 |
Crichton Horne & Associates, 109 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch | Registered | 04 Apr 2002 - 09 Sep 2008 |
54 Averill Street, Shirley, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 12 Apr 1995 - 04 Apr 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cheryl Ann Cowden Individual |
Redcliffs Christchurch 8081 |
12 Apr 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Caroleen Ann Crack Individual |
Redcliffs Christchurch 8081 |
12 Apr 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Trustees Of Cowden Trust Other |
Redcliffs Christchurch 8081 |
16 Aug 2005 - current |
Waitikiri Golf Pro Limited 46 Acheron Drive |
|
Ambience Tiling Limited 46 Acheron Drive |
|
Triton Buildworks Limited 46 Acheron Drive |
|
Elevator & Electrical Services Limited 46 Acheron Drive |
|
Dna Steel Construction Limited 46 Acheron Drive |
|
D Frost Refrigeration And Air Conditioning Limited 46 Acheron Drive |
Patersons Funeral Services (2013) Limited 467 Wairakei Road |
Christchurch Crematorium Funeral Services Limited 467 Wairakei Road |
Bell, Lamb & Trotter (2014) Limited 297 Ferry Road |
The Little Kiwi Funeral Co. Limited 297 Ferry Road |
Heartland Funerals Limited 5 Delamare Way |
Christchurch Funeral Services Limited 186 Talbot Street |